Global Patent Index - EP 1318536 A1

EP 1318536 A1 2003-06-11 - Differential pressure switch

Title (en)

Differential pressure switch

Title (de)

Differenzdruckschalter-sensor

Title (fr)

Interrupteur actionné par pression différentielle

Publication

EP 1318536 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025125 A

Priority

DE 10159536 A

Abstract (en)

A switch element (3) is triggered by a movement of a piston held within cylindrical bore of a piston housing. A spring (9) applies a return force towards a piston head (1a). The piston tip (1c) positioned on the switching element, is sealed to the cylindrical bore by a rolling diaphragm (4) which is movable within the range of axial movement of the piston.

A switch element (3) is triggered by a movement of a piston held within cylindrical bore of a piston housing. A spring (9) applies a return force towards a piston head (1a). The piston tip (1c) positioned on the switching element, is sealed to the cylindrical bore by a rolling diaphragm (4) which is movable within the range of axial movement of the piston.

Abstract (de)

Differenzdruckschalter mit einem Kolben, der in einem Kolbengehäuse in einer Kolbenbohrung gegen die Kraft eines Rückstellelements geführt ist, wobei der Kolbenfuß mit einem Druck P1 beaufschlagt ist, während der Bohrungsraum um den verjüngten Kolbenschaft mit einem Druck P2 beaufschlagt ist, wobei durch Bewegung des Kolbens ein Schaltvorgang ausgelöst wird, wobei die Kolbenspitze (1c) im Zusammenwirken mit einem Schaltelement (3) gegenüber der Zylinderbohrung (2) durch eine im Umfang der axialen Kolbenbewegung bewegliche Rollmembran (4) abgedichtet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 35/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/24 (2006.01); H01H 35/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/24 (2013.01); H01H 35/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318536 A1 20030611; DE 10159536 A1 20030626; US 2003102203 A1 20030605; US 6621021 B2 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI