Global Patent Index - EP 1318537 A1

EP 1318537 A1 2003-06-11 - Set of electrical units for controlling power units

Title (en)

Set of electrical units for controlling power units

Title (de)

Einheit von elektrischen Vorrichtungen zur Steuerung von Leistungsvorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'appareils électriques pour la commande d'appareils de puissance

Publication

EP 1318537 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01204964 A

Priority

FR 0016625 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical power control mechanism includes a switch-circuit breaker (CD) with a number of current cutting terminals activated by an electromagnet. An auxiliary module (MS) is connected to the power output of the switch-circuit breaker. <??>The electrical power control mechanism includes a switch-circuit breaker (CD) having a number of current cutting terminals activated by an electromagnet, and a release control mechanism. An auxiliary module (MS) is connected to the power output of the switch-circuit breaker with control links to the switch-circuit breaker. A connection control block (R) has control connectors and is connected to the control outputs (A1,A2,21,22,14,13) of the switch-circuit breaker, to which further control terminals (Ba) may be attached.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un ensemble d'appareils électriques pour la commande d'appareils de puissance, constitué d'une part par un contacteur-disjoncteur (CD) ayant une pluralité de pôles de coupure actionnés par un électro-aimant (E) et par un mécanisme de commande et déclenchement (D, S) et d'autre part par un module auxiliaire (MS) branché aux sorties puissance du contacteur-disjoncteur et connecté par des liaisons de contrôle à ce dernier, caractérisé par le fait qu'il comporte un bloc de raccordement contrôle (R) pourvu de connecteurs de contrôle (G) se connectant à des sorties de contrôle (A1, A2, 21, 22, 14, 13) du contacteur-disjoncteur sur lesquelles on peut connecter de manière alternative un bornier de contrôle (Ba) et des connecteurs de contrôle (J) se connectant à des sorties de contrôle (S1, S2, S3, 82, 84, 81) du module auxiliaire (MS) sur lesquelles on peut connecter de manière alternative un bornier de contrôle (Bs), des liaisons électriques reliant les dits connecteurs de contrôle (G, J). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 73/00; H01H 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/00 (2006.01); H01H 89/08 (2006.01); H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 89/08 (2013.01); H01H 51/005 (2013.01); H01H 71/0207 (2013.01); H01H 71/0228 (2013.01); H01H 71/126 (2013.01); H01H 2071/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2818435 A1 20020621; FR 2818435 B1 20031031; DE 60125557 D1 20070208; DE 60125557 T2 20070705; EP 1318537 A1 20030611; EP 1318537 B1 20061227; ES 2277888 T3 20070801; US 2002130742 A1 20020919; US 6452468 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171106

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60125557

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2277888 T3

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60125557 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI