Global Patent Index - EP 1318564 A1

EP 1318564 A1 2003-06-11 - Antenna, in particular mobile phone antenna and/or radio antenna, provided with means for avoiding twisting

Title (en)

Antenna, in particular mobile phone antenna and/or radio antenna, provided with means for avoiding twisting

Title (de)

Antenne, insbesondere Mobilfunkantenne und/oder Radioantenne, mit einem Verdrehschutz

Title (fr)

Antenne, en particulier antenne radio mobile et/ou antenne radio, avec protection contre la torsion

Publication

EP 1318564 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023762 A

Priority

DE 10160252 A

Abstract (en)

The antenna has a base body (6) with a contact region (3) and a receiving arrangement, whereby the base body and receiving arrangements are at least partly enclosed by a casing that especially consists of a soft material. The base body is designed so that when the finished antenna is fitted relative movement does not occur between the base body and the casing.

Abstract (de)

Antenne, insbesondere Mobilfunkantenne oder Radioantenne, mit einem Verdrehschutz. Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antenne, insbesondere eine Mobilfunkantenne oder Radioantenne für Fahrzeuge, wobei ein Grundkörper der Antenne in Längsrichtung ausgerichtete Nuten aufweist, um eine Relativbewegung zwischen dem Grundkörper und einer Ummantelung der Antenne bei deren Handhabung zu verhindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/40; H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/40 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4435713 A 19840306 - GASPARAITIS BERNARD [US], et al
  • [A] US 6271804 B1 20010807 - YANAGISAWA WASUKE [JP], et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 08 29 August 1997 (1997-08-29)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318564 A1 20030611; US 2003156066 A1 20030821; US 6847331 B2 20050125

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080526

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI