Global Patent Index - EP 1318690 A1

EP 1318690 A1 2003-06-11 - Call control method and arrangement

Title (en)

Call control method and arrangement

Title (de)

Anrufsteuerungsverfahren und Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de controle d appels et ensemble

Publication

EP 1318690 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02102669 A

Priority

FI 20012404 A

Abstract (en)

An object of the invention is a call control method for user equipment (170) which can be in connection with more than one radio system (130, 160). The user equipment is under a first radio system (160). In the method, a first system (160) detects that there is a need to transfer data to the user equipment. A paging message is transmitted (410) from the first radio system to the user equipment, the message containing a command to move over to the cell of a second radio system (130). Reselection of the cell is started (412) in the user equipment on the basis of the message. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 68/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 68/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318690 A1 20030611; FI 20012404 A0 20011205; FI 20012404 A 20030606; US 2003157937 A1 20030821

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091028

2009-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090617

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO