Global Patent Index - EP 1318693 A2

EP 1318693 A2 2003-06-11 - Heating element and manufacturing process of this heating element

Title (en)

Heating element and manufacturing process of this heating element

Title (de)

Heizelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Heizelements

Title (fr)

Elément chauffant et procédé de fabrication de cet élément chauffant

Publication

EP 1318693 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027257 A

Priority

DE 10161535 A

Abstract (en)

The spiral heating wire (14) is located in the tube (12) with terminal plates (30,32) at each end having deformed tabs which engage V-shaped depressions (34,36) in the tube wall by rotating the terminal plates. Supports (48) engage the outer recesses.

Abstract (de)

Um ein Heizelement, insbesondere für Toaster, mit einer Heizwendel, mit einem Trägerkörper für die Heizwendel und mit elektrischen Anschlußelementen, welche mit der Heizwendel verbunden sind, zu schaffen, welches auf möglichst einfache und kostengünstige Weise herstellbar ist, ist vorgesehen, daß an dem Trägerkörper mindestens ein Haltesteg zum Halten eines zugeordneten Anschlußelements gebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 3/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/06 (2006.01); H05B 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 3/10 (2013.01); H05B 3/06 (2013.01); H05B 3/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318693 A2 20030611; EP 1318693 A3 20060104; DE 10161535 A1 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081126

2006-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-01-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO