Global Patent Index - EP 1318696 A1

EP 1318696 A1 2003-06-11 - Method for electrically heating a furnace for thermal treatment of metallic workpieces

Title (en)

Method for electrically heating a furnace for thermal treatment of metallic workpieces

Title (de)

Verfahren zum elektrischen Beheizen von Öfen für die Wärmebehandlung metallischer Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Procédé de chauffage électrique d'un four pour le traitment thermique de pièces métalliques

Publication

EP 1318696 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01128278 A

Priority

EP 01128278 A

Abstract (en)

The heating elements (8a-8c) of a vacuum furnace are supplied with a heating voltage that is generated on a secondary circuit of a variable reactance transformer (6) connected to a three-phase power network. The primary coil windings of the transformer are switched from delta connection to star connection in different heating phases and the time for switching of the connection is determined as a function of furnace temperature.

Abstract (de)

Um ein Verfahren zum elektrischen Beheizen von Öfen für die Wärmebehandlung metallischer Werkstücke, insbesondere von zum Plasmaaufkohlen oder -nitrieren einsetzbaren Vakuumöfen, bei dem die Heizelemente (8a, 8b, 8c) eines Ofens mit einer Heizspannung versorgt werden, die auf der Sekundärseite eines an ein Drehstromnetzwerk angeschlossenen Drehstromtransformators (6) erzeugt wird, dahingehend weiter zu bilden, daß sich auf einfache und kostengünstige Weise ein verhältnismäßig geringer Blindleistungsanteil erzielen läßt, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die primärseitigen Spulenwicklungen des Drehstromtransformators (6) während einer ersten Heizphase in Dreieckschaltung und während einer zweiten Heizphase in Sternschaltung geschaltet werden, wobei der Umschaltzeitpunkt von Dreieckschaltung auf Sternschaltung in Abhängigkeit von für den Heizvorgang charakteristischen Betriebsparametern bestimmt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/36 (2006.01); H05B 3/62 (2006.01); H05B 3/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/62 (2013.01); C23C 8/36 (2013.01); H05B 3/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318696 A1 20030611; EP 1318696 B1 20050615; AT 298185 T 20050715; CN 1242089 C 20060215; CN 1424426 A 20030618; DE 50106538 D1 20050721; ES 2242699 T3 20051116; US 2003098301 A1 20030529; US 6794618 B2 20040921

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141129

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151230

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 298185 T

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50106538

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: IPSEN INTERNATIONAL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: IPSEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Free text: IPSEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH#FLUTSTRASSE 78#47533 KLEVE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- IPSEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH#FLUTSTRASSE 78#47533 KLEVE (DE)

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051128

2005-11-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242699 T3

2005-09-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-08-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106538 P 20050721

2005-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI