Global Patent Index - EP 1318737 A1

EP 1318737 A1 2003-06-18 - FURNITURE DRIVE EMBODIED AS A DOUBLE DRIVE

Title (en)

FURNITURE DRIVE EMBODIED AS A DOUBLE DRIVE

Title (de)

ALS DOPPELANTRIEB AUSGEBILDETER MÖBELANTRIEB

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR MEUBLE, SE PRESENTANT SOUS LA FORME D'UN DOUBLE DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT

Publication

EP 1318737 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01960617 A

Priority

  • DE 10046750 A
  • EP 0109000 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224035A1] The invention relates to a furniture drive (2) which is embodied as a double drive and used to move parts of a piece of furniture in relation to each other. Said furniture drive comprises two drive units (4, 4'), each one having a linearly movable drive element for pivoting a pivoting lever (18, 18') which co-operates with a part to be moved of the piece of furniture when the furniture drive (2) is in the assembly position. According to the invention, the linearly movable drive element or an actuating element connected thereto comprises a recess (22) into which the pivoting lever (18) projects in the radial direction thereof when the furniture drive (2) is in the assembly position. An inner wall of the recess (22) forms a bearing surface (34) for the pivoting lever (18). The inventive furniture drive has a low overall height and a simple design, and can thus be produced economically.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/10 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); F16H 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/041 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18576 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224035A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20115507 U1 20011213; AT 313988 T 20060115; AU 8206301 A 20020402; CN 100496339 C 20090610; CN 1461195 A 20031210; DE 10046750 C1 20020418; DE 50108571 D1 20060202; DK 1318737 T3 20060515; EP 1318737 A1 20030618; EP 1318737 B1 20051228; ES 2256282 T3 20060716; JP 2004508866 A 20040325; JP 4920166 B2 20120418; US 2004020316 A1 20040205; US 7331557 B2 20080219; WO 0224035 A1 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150804

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-03-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108571

2015-06-03 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50108571

- Effective date: 20141124

2015-04-29 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20141124

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140825

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-24 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50108571

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2013-12-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DEWERTOKIN GMBH

- Effective date: 20060928

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080701

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060803

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *LINAK A/SSMEDEVAENGET 8, GUDERUP, DK-6430 NORDBOR

- Effective date: 20051228

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20051228

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060803

2007-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DEWERT ANTRIEBS- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2007-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-11-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEWERT ANTRIEBS- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256282 T3

2006-07-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-07-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

2006-05-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060406

2006-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2006-04-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

- Free text: LINAK A/S#SMEDEVAENGET 8, GUDERUP#DK-6430 NORDBORG (DK) $ CIMOSYS LIMITED#LE GALLAIS CHAMBERS, 54 BATH STREET#ST. HELIER, JERSEY JE4 8YD (GB) -TRANSFER TO- LINAK A/S#SMEDEVAENGET 8, GUDERUP#DK-6430 NORDBORG (DK)

2006-04-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-03-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108571 P 20060202

2006-01-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIMOSYS LIMITED

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI