Global Patent Index - EP 1318738 A1

EP 1318738 A1 2003-06-18 - FURNITURE DRIVE IN THE FORM OF A DUAL DRIVE

Title (en)

FURNITURE DRIVE IN THE FORM OF A DUAL DRIVE

Title (de)

ALS DOPPELANTRIEB AUSGEBILDETER MÖBELANTRIEB

Title (fr)

ENTRAINEMENT POUR MEUBLES CON U COMME DOUBLE ENTRAINEMENT

Publication

EP 1318738 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01974265 A

Priority

  • DE 10046752 A
  • DE 20106189 U
  • EP 0110815 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224034A1] The invention relates to a furniture drive (2) for adjusting parts of a piece of furniture in relation to one another which is configured as a dual drive. Said drive comprises two drive units (4, 4'), every drive unit (4, 4') being provided with a linearly displaceable drive element that is functionally linked with a pivoted lever for pivoting said lever in the mounting position of the furniture drive. Said pivoted lever in turn is functionally linked with a part of the piece of furniture to be adjusted. The drive according to the invention is further characterized in that the linearly displaceable drive element or a support element (24) linked therewith is provided with a support surface (26) for supporting the pivoted lever (18) in a position remote from its pivot axis (16) in the mounting position of the furniture drive (2), which surface is inclined with respect to the axis of motion (29) of the drive element. The inventive furniture drive (2) is simple in design and therefore inexpensive, it is furthermore advantageous in that it is very compact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A61G 7/015 (2006.01); A61G 7/018 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/041 (2013.01); A47C 20/042 (2013.01); A61G 7/015 (2013.01); A61G 7/018 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18056 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18216 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18296 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18576 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2101 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224034A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224034 A1 20020328; AT 318089 T 20060315; AU 9382201 A 20020402; CN 100496338 C 20090610; CN 1461194 A 20031210; DE 10193929 D2 20031023; DE 50109014 D1 20060427; DK 1318738 T3 20060703; EP 1318738 A1 20030618; EP 1318738 B1 20060222; ES 2258552 T3 20060901; JP 2004508865 A 20040325; JP 3881623 B2 20070214; US 2003172756 A1 20030918; US 6945131 B2 20050920

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-16 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2015-04-28 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2015-03-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 318089 T

- Effective date: 20140926

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060222

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060222

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130920

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-15 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 50109014

- Effective date: 20150115

2014-12-10 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20140926

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-14 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141007

2014-09-26 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50109014

2014-09-26 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50109014

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-12-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DEWERTOKIN GMBH

- Effective date: 20061120

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090919

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090919

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090919

2010-05-10 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080820

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080911

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060919

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060523

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *LINAK A/SSMEDEVAENGET 8, GUDERUP, DK-6430 NORDBOR

- Effective date: 20060222

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20060222

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060919

2007-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DEWERT ANTRIEBS- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2006-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEWERT ANTRIEBS- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061120

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2258552 T3

2006-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-07-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060724

2006-07-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-07-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2006-05-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109014 P 20060427

2006-03-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIMOSYS LIMITED

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINAK A/S

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI