Global Patent Index - EP 1318740 A1

EP 1318740 A1 2003-06-18 - HOLDING DEVICE

Title (en)

HOLDING DEVICE

Title (de)

HALTEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE

Publication

EP 1318740 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01971985 A

Priority

  • DE 20016472 U
  • DE 20103790 U
  • DE 20105005 U
  • EP 0110039 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2004099782A1] The invention relates to an improved holding device for receiving pole-shaped objects, especially trees, Christmas trees for example. The inventive device has the following characteristics: at least one component of the holding elements (4-4c; 104-104c) and the swivel axes (7-7c; 114-114c) associated thereto can be moved towards and away from the axis of symmetry and/or central axis (115), and the holding elements (4-4c; 104-104c) and the swivel axis or tilting axis (7-7c; 114-114c) associated thereto can be moved by means of the clamping device (2; 102), against the force of a spring device (10; 13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 33/12 (2006.01); F16M 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 33/1213 (2013.01); A47G 2033/1286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2004099782 A1 20040527; US 6988702 B2 20060124; AT 266342 T 20040515; AU 9181301 A 20020402; CZ 20030839 A3 20030917; EP 1318740 A1 20030618; EP 1318740 B1 20040512; EP 1318740 B9 20040929; PL 196850 B1 20080229; PL 366294 A1 20050124; WO 0224041 A1 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130830

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 266342 T

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-03-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120301

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102286 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRINNER INNOVATION GMBH

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI