Global Patent Index - EP 1318790 A1

EP 1318790 A1 2003-06-18 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR RECTAL AND VAGINAL ADMINISTRATION

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR RECTAL AND VAGINAL ADMINISTRATION

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR REKTALEN UND VAGINALEN VERABREICHUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES POUR ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE RECTALE ET VAGINALE

Publication

EP 1318790 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00961968 A

Priority

US 0025634 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224170A1] The pharmaceutical compositions of the present invention comprise rectally and vaginally administerable dosage forms that contain effervescent agents as penetration enhancers for drugs. Effervescence occurs in the rectum or vagina, once the dosage form is administered or at a predetermined time following administration. The effervescent agents can be used alone or in combination with pH adjusting substance, which further promote dissolution and absorption of the active ingredient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/20; A61K 7/16; A61K 31/495

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/02 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0007 (2013.01); A61K 9/0031 (2013.01); A61K 9/0034 (2013.01); A61K 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224170 A1 20020328; AU 2000273847 B2 20060914; AU 7384700 A 20020402; CA 2422424 A1 20020328; CA 2422424 C 20091201; EP 1318790 A1 20030618; EP 1318790 A4 20060201; JP 2004509142 A 20040325

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-31 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20091115

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060515

2006-02-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051220

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PATHER, S., INDIRAN

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBINSON, JOSEPH, R.

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EICHMAN, JONATHAN, D.

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KHANKARI, RAJENDRA, K.

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HONTZ, JOHN

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE