Global Patent Index - EP 1318795 A2

EP 1318795 A2 2003-06-18 - ANTHELMINTICS FOR PREVENTING PARASITIC INFECTIONS IN HUMANS AND ANIMALS

Title (en)

ANTHELMINTICS FOR PREVENTING PARASITIC INFECTIONS IN HUMANS AND ANIMALS

Title (de)

ANTHELMINTHIKA ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON PARASITÄREN INFEKTIONEN BEI MENSCH UND TIER

Title (fr)

ANTHELMINTHIQUES SERVANT A LUTTER CONTRE LES INFECTIONS PARASITAIRES CHEZ L'HOMME ET L'ANIMAL

Publication

EP 1318795 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01969321 A

Priority

  • DE 10032880 A
  • EP 0107296 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0202089A2] The invention relates to agents containing specific active ingredients that act as repellents and to their use for preventing humans or animals from being infected with parasitic flatworms (platyhelminths).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/221 (2006.01); A61K 31/223 (2006.01); A61P 33/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/221 (2013.01); A61K 31/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0202089A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0202089 A2 20020110; WO 0202089 A3 20030320; AU 8961201 A 20020114; BR 0112366 A 20040106; CA 2414690 A1 20020110; CN 1452484 A 20031029; DE 10032880 A1 20020117; EP 1318795 A2 20030618; HU 0303837 A2 20040329; JP 2004501961 A 20040122; KR 20030047984 A 20030618; PL 365638 A1 20050110; US 2004006136 A1 20040108; ZA 200300057 B 20040705

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050825

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI