Global Patent Index - EP 1318819 A1

EP 1318819 A1 2003-06-18 - TREATMENT OF TRAUMA, AND OTHER INDICATIONS

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF TRAUMA, AND OTHER INDICATIONS

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG VON TRAUMA UND ANDEREN INDIKATIONEN

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENTS DE TRAUMAS ET AUTRES INDICATIONS

Publication

EP 1318819 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00957680 A

Priority

US 0023072 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0215913A1] Provided is a method of treating an area affected by a trauma, such as a corneal wound or internal trauma, comprising administering to the affected area a trauma treating effective amount of a composition comprising a polyanionic polymer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/765 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/74 (2006.01); A61L 26/00 (2006.01); A61L 31/04 (2006.01); A61L 31/14 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 26/0014 (2013.01); A61K 9/0048 (2013.01); A61K 31/74 (2013.01); A61L 26/0028 (2013.01); A61L 26/008 (2013.01); A61L 31/043 (2013.01); A61L 31/048 (2013.01); A61L 31/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0215913 A1 20020228; AU 6926400 A 20020304; BR 0017340 A 20031209; CA 2425206 A1 20020228; EP 1318819 A1 20030618; EP 1318819 A4 20060315; JP 2004506688 A 20040304

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-03-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060126

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRANKLIN, RICHARD

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COWLING, DIDIER, S., P.

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUBBELL, JEFFREY A.

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN DE WETERING, PETRA

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRANKLIN, RICHARD

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COWLING, DIDIER, S., P.

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUBBELL, JEFFREY A.

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN DE WETERING, PETRA

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI