Global Patent Index - EP 1318838 A1

EP 1318838 A1 2003-06-18 - USE OF A NUCLEIC ACID/PEI COMPLEX

Title (en)

USE OF A NUCLEIC ACID/PEI COMPLEX

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON PEI/DNA KOMPLEXES

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UN COMPLEXE ACIDE NUCLEIQUE/PEI

Publication

EP 1318838 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01972186 A

Priority

  • FR 0102952 W
  • FR 0012126 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224231A1] The invention concerns the use of a nucleic acid/cationic polymer complex, preferably polyethyleneimine (PEI) for preparing a composition for intraventricular stereotactic screening of stem cells of the brain for preparing a medicine for treating neurodegenerative and/or demyelinating diseases. The invention further concerns a method for obtaining an animal whereof the genome of stem cells of the brain are modified by using said complex. The invention also concerns a method for obtaining an animal for screening compounds designed to modify the disposition of stem cells of the brain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/48; C12N 15/87; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/87 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/87 (2013.01); A61K 47/59 (2017.08); A61K 47/645 (2017.08); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224231 A1 20020328; AU 9197501 A 20020402; CA 2423703 A1 20020328; EP 1318838 A1 20030618; FR 2814370 A1 20020329; FR 2814370 B1 20040820; US 2005101552 A1 20050512; US 7795031 B2 20100914

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110712

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS

2006-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEMENEIX, BARBARA

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEMKINE, GREGORY

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEVI, GIOVANNI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI