Global Patent Index - EP 1318846 A2

EP 1318846 A2 2003-06-18 - ELECTRICALLY POWERED SURGICAL IRRIGATOR

Title (en)

ELECTRICALLY POWERED SURGICAL IRRIGATOR

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENER CHIRURGISCHER IRRIGATOR

Title (fr)

IRRIGATEUR CHIRURGICAL ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1318846 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01973747 A

Priority

  • US 0142237 W
  • US 66817800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224253A2] A surgical irrigator comprises a pumping unit connected to a handpiece by means of elongated irrigation tubing. The pumping unit includes an impeller, batteries and a battery powered motor to drive the impeller. The handpiece includes an irrigation valve which, when depressed, opens the valve and permits irrigation liquid to flow to the surgical site. A flow sensing device is positioned at the outlet of the pumping unit. When the irrigation valve is opened, liquid flow through the flow sensing device under the influence of gravity causes a float to move with the liquid. A light source provides a light beam which is interrupted by movement of the float. This is detected by a photosensor which generates a signal to turn the motor on, causing the pump to operate. A battery isolator switch is provided which interrupts the circuit between the batteries and motor so that the device cannot be turned on during transit and storage. A one-way valve connected between the source of irrigation liquid and pump maintains the liquid in the irrigator at a pressure above atmospheric when the irrigation valve is closed. The pumping unit includes an inlet which is connected to one end of a short flexible tube, the other end of which is connected to a standard spike for connecting the pumping unit to an irrigation bag. The pumping unit also includes clips which support the pumping unit on IV pole or the like. The spike is coated with silicone which makes it relatively easy to connect the pumping unit to the irrigation bag.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/00 (2006.01); A61M 3/00 (2006.01); A61M 3/02 (2006.01); A61M 5/00 (2006.01); A61M 39/02 (2006.01); A61M 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 3/0258 (2013.01); A61M 1/0064 (2013.01); A61M 3/0266 (2013.01); A61M 2205/3306 (2013.01); A61M 2205/3331 (2013.01); A61M 2205/8206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224253A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224253 A2 20020328; WO 0224253 A3 20030306; AU 9329801 A 20020402; EP 1318846 A2 20030618; JP 2004509674 A 20040402

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051114

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DELK, MICHAEL

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FELIX, AUGUSTUS

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR