Global Patent Index - EP 1318858 A2

EP 1318858 A2 2003-06-18 - GAS GENERATING DEVICE

Title (en)

GAS GENERATING DEVICE

Title (de)

GASERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF GENERANT DU GAZ

Publication

EP 1318858 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01966447 A

Priority

  • US 0127114 W
  • US 66124400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222214A2] A method and a device for producing a sufficient quantity of a fire suppressing gaseous product to substantially suppress a fire. The device has a first stage gas source containing a pyrotechnic gas generating materiel and a second stage gas source in fluid communication at a first location with an outlet of the first stage gas source and, at a second location, with an outlet for dispersing gas. The second stage gas source contains at least one liquified gas or supercritical carbon dioxide, where the first stage gas source is capable of providing a sufficient quantity of gas at a sufficiently high temperature to vaporize at least a portion of the liquified gas or supercritical carbon dioxide in the second stage gas source, thereby producing a fire suppressing gaseous output, which exits the device through the outlet for dispersing gas, in an amount sufficient to at least partially suppress a fire. At least one of the pyrotechnic gas generating material, the liquified gas, and the supercritical carbon dioxide is mixed with or includes at least one fire suppressant material selected from the group consisting of elemental halogens and alkali metal halides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 1/06; A62C 5/00; A62C 35/02; A62C 39/00; A62D 1/00; A62D 1/08; C06D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 5/00 (2006.01); A62D 1/06 (2006.01); A62C 13/22 (2006.01); B01J 7/00 (2006.01); B60R 22/46 (2006.01); C06B 23/00 (2006.01); C06B 29/00 (2006.01); C06B 31/00 (2006.01); C06B 43/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/06 (2013.01); A62C 5/006 (2013.01); A62C 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222214A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222214 A2 20020321; WO 0222214 A3 20020606; AT 473786 T 20100715; AU 8695801 A 20020326; DE 60142570 D1 20100826; EP 1318858 A2 20030618; EP 1318858 B1 20100714; JP 2004508182 A 20040318; JP 4813751 B2 20111109

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2018-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60142570

2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60142570

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140831

2013-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60142570

- Representative's name: KSNH PATENTANWAELTE KLUNKER/SCHMITT-NILSON/HIR, DE

2013-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60142570

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60142570

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101025

2011-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101015

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101115

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100714

2010-11-10 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100714

2010-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60142570 P 20100826

2010-08-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 5/00 20060101AFI20100129BHEP

2010-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 13/22 20060101ALI20100129BHEP

2009-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090615

2007-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOODRICH CORPORATION

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI