Global Patent Index - EP 1318896 A1

EP 1318896 A1 2003-06-18 - BATTERY OPERATED ELECTRIC TOOL

Title (en)

BATTERY OPERATED ELECTRIC TOOL

Title (de)

BATTERIEGESPEISTES ELEKTROWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL ELECTRIQUE ALIMENTE PAR PILES

Publication

EP 1318896 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01951395 A

Priority

  • DE 0102243 W
  • DE 10039777 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0214029A1] The invention relates to a battery operated electric tool (10) provided with a machine housing (11), which comprises a long approximately rod-shaped housing part (12) with an electric drive motor (13) contained therein and with an end part (15) on which a connecting face (16) situated at the end and having a plug-in receptacle (17) for exchangeably attaching a battery pack (14) is provided. Said battery pack is provided with a connecting part (18) which, for placing against the connecting face (16), comprises a bearing surface (19) assigned thereto and a plug-in part (20) that engages inside the plug-in receptacle (17). The end part (15) is bent with regard to the housing part (12) from the longitudinal direction of extension toward one side. The connecting face (16), which is situated at the end, of the end part (15) extends inside a plane (21) that is slanted with regard to a plane (22) extending in an approximately orthogonal manner with regard to the longitudinal axis (23) of the housing part (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/00 (2006.01); B24B 23/02 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/028 (2013.01); B25F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0214029A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0214029 A1 20020221; CN 1264657 C 20060719; CN 1388772 A 20030101; DE 10039777 A1 20020228; DE 50113603 D1 20080327; EP 1318896 A1 20030618; EP 1318896 B1 20080213; JP 2004505793 A 20040226; US 2003115995 A1 20030626; US 6935438 B2 20050830

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100616

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100616

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081114

2008-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113603 P 20080327

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-02-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070327

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOFMANN, ALBRECHT

2003-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRONDORFER, HARALD

2003-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HECKMANN, MARKUS

2003-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHOMISCH, THOMAS

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR