Global Patent Index - EP 1318906 A1

EP 1318906 A1 2003-06-18 - CONTROLLER FOR A HYDRAULIC PRESS AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF

Title (en)

CONTROLLER FOR A HYDRAULIC PRESS AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HYDRAULISCHE PRESSE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR UNE PRESSE HYDRAULIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR SON FONCTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1318906 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01956735 A

Priority

  • CH 18262000 A
  • IB 0101527 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224441A1] The invention relates to a controller for a hydraulic press, comprising a pressing cylinder (1), a reservoir (2), a valve group (3), a pressure medium reservoir (7) and a hydraulic pump (6), connected together by means of a cylinder line (4), a reservoir line (5) and a tank line (8). According to the invention, a pressure converter (9) is arranged on the valve group (3), which may operate as a pressure amplifier or pressure reducer. The particular mode of action of said controller is achieved whereby the valve group (3) comprises a pre-press valve (11), a low-pressure chamber outlet valve (12), a low-pressure chamber inlet valve (13), a main press valve (14), a closing valve (15), a pressure release valve (16) and a 3-way valve (17), which may be operated by a particular control sequence. Said invention is applicable in hydraulic presses and of particular advantage in presses for the forming of ceramic pieces such as tiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/16; B30B 15/22; F15B 1/02; F15B 3/00; F15B 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 3/00 (2006.01); B30B 1/32 (2006.01); B30B 15/16 (2006.01); B30B 15/22 (2006.01); F15B 1/02 (2006.01); F15B 11/028 (2006.01); F15B 11/032 (2006.01); F15B 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/161 (2013.01); B30B 15/163 (2013.01); B30B 15/22 (2013.01); F15B 1/024 (2013.01); F15B 11/0325 (2013.01); F15B 21/14 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20538 (2013.01); F15B 2211/212 (2013.01); F15B 2211/214 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3144 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/426 (2013.01); F15B 2211/455 (2013.01); F15B 2211/46 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6313 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6336 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7052 (2013.01); F15B 2211/775 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224441A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224441 A1 20020328; AT 444157 T 20091015; AU 7865101 A 20020402; BR 0113991 A 20030812; BR 0113991 B1 20100518; CA 2422879 A1 20030319; CN 1243637 C 20060301; CN 1461255 A 20031210; DE 50115141 D1 20091112; EP 1318906 A1 20030618; EP 1318906 B1 20090930; ES 2329443 T3 20091126; JP 2004522580 A 20040729; JP 5058426 B2 20121024; KR 20030032042 A 20030423; US 2003167936 A1 20030911; US 6973780 B2 20051213

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2017-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150825

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 444157 T

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115141

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090930

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100824

2011-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-11-26 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2329443 T3

2009-11-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115141 P 20091112

2009-10-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT

2009-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-09-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAEIS GMBH

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070309

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAEIS GMBH

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI