Global Patent Index - EP 1318965 A1

EP 1318965 A1 2003-06-18 - MATERIAL HANDLING MACHINE

Title (en)

MATERIAL HANDLING MACHINE

Title (de)

MATERIALUMSCHLAGGERÄT

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE TRANSBORDEMENT DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 1318965 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01982312 A

Priority

  • EP 01982312 A
  • EP 0110787 W
  • EP 00120389 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188707A1] The excavator has an upper carriage (20) with driver cab (21) rotatably mounted on the undercarriage (10) and movable between a lower position resting on the undercarriage and a raised upper working position spaced above same. The adjusting mechanism comprises a steering rod assembly (9) with servo cylinder (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/62; B66C 23/42; B66C 23/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/36 (2006.01); B66C 23/42 (2006.01); B66C 23/62 (2006.01); B66C 23/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/54 (2013.01); B66C 23/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222489A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188707 A1 20020320; DE 50110065 D1 20060720; EP 1318965 A1 20030618; EP 1318965 B1 20060607; US 2004033124 A1 20040219; US 7204378 B2 20070417; WO 0222489 A1 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180404

2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110065

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160918

2017-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160918

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50110065

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110065 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT

2005-09-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI IT LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR