Global Patent Index - EP 1318978 A2

EP 1318978 A2 2003-06-18 - N-ACYLSULFONAMIDE APOPTOSIS PROMOTERS

Title (en)

N-ACYLSULFONAMIDE APOPTOSIS PROMOTERS

Title (de)

N-ACYLSULFONAMID-APOPTOSIS-FÖRDERER

Title (fr)

PROMOTEURS DE L'APOPTOSE A BASE DE N-ACYLSULFONAMIDES

Publication

EP 1318978 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01971244 A

Priority

  • US 0129432 W
  • US 66650800 A
  • US 93558101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224636A2] N-Benzoyl arylsulfonamides having the formula (I) are BCL-Xl inhibitors and are useful for promoting apoptosis. Also disclosed are BCL-Xl inhibiting compositions and methods of promoting apoptosis in a mammal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 311/51; C07C 317/28; C07C 323/12; C07C 323/17; C07C 323/25; C07C 323/30; C07C 323/37; C07C 323/58; C07C 323/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/18 (2006.01); A61K 31/428 (2006.01); A61K 31/63 (2006.01); A61K 31/635 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C07C 311/46 (2006.01); C07C 311/51 (2006.01); C07C 317/28 (2006.01); C07C 323/12 (2006.01); C07C 323/17 (2006.01); C07C 323/25 (2006.01); C07C 323/30 (2006.01); C07C 323/37 (2006.01); C07C 323/43 (2006.01); C07C 323/44 (2006.01); C07C 323/48 (2006.01); C07C 323/58 (2006.01); C07C 323/60 (2006.01); C07D 203/10 (2006.01); C07D 205/04 (2006.01); C07D 205/12 (2006.01); C07D 207/09 (2006.01); C07D 207/24 (2006.01); C07D 207/404 (2006.01); C07D 209/08 (2006.01); C07D 209/52 (2006.01); C07D 209/54 (2006.01); C07D 209/96 (2006.01); C07D 211/14 (2006.01); C07D 211/44 (2006.01); C07D 211/70 (2006.01); C07D 211/74 (2006.01); C07D 213/56 (2006.01); C07D 213/61 (2006.01); C07D 213/64 (2006.01); C07D 213/69 (2006.01); C07D 213/70 (2006.01); C07D 213/71 (2006.01); C07D 215/14 (2006.01); C07D 215/227 (2006.01); C07D 215/38 (2006.01); C07D 215/48 (2006.01); C07D 217/04 (2006.01); C07D 221/20 (2006.01); C07D 231/12 (2006.01); C07D 233/60 (2006.01); C07D 235/08 (2006.01); C07D 235/26 (2006.01); C07D 241/08 (2006.01); C07D 241/16 (2006.01); C07D 249/04 (2006.01); C07D 263/32 (2006.01); C07D 263/56 (2006.01); C07D 263/58 (2006.01); C07D 277/62 (2006.01); C07D 277/64 (2006.01); C07D 295/13 (2006.01); C07D 295/155 (2006.01); C07D 295/16 (2006.01); C07D 295/185 (2006.01); C07D 295/20 (2006.01); C07D 295/205 (2006.01); C07D 295/215 (2006.01); C07D 295/26 (2006.01); C07D 307/14 (2006.01); C07D 317/54 (2006.01); C07D 333/28 (2006.01); C07D 333/68 (2006.01); C07D 333/70 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/04 (2006.01); C07D 405/06 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 451/02 (2006.01); C07D 491/107 (2006.01); C07D 207/40 (2006.01); C07D 215/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/404 (2013.01); C07C 311/51 (2013.01); C07C 317/28 (2013.01); C07C 323/12 (2013.01); C07C 323/17 (2013.01); C07C 323/25 (2013.01); C07C 323/30 (2013.01); C07C 323/37 (2013.01); C07C 323/58 (2013.01); C07C 323/60 (2013.01); C07D 203/10 (2013.01); C07D 205/12 (2013.01); C07D 207/24 (2013.01); C07D 209/08 (2013.01); C07D 209/96 (2013.01); C07D 211/44 (2013.01); C07D 211/70 (2013.01); C07D 211/74 (2013.01); C07D 213/61 (2013.01); C07D 213/70 (2013.01); C07D 213/71 (2013.01); C07D 215/14 (2013.01); C07D 215/227 (2013.01); C07D 215/48 (2013.01); C07D 217/04 (2013.01); C07D 221/20 (2013.01); C07D 231/12 (2013.01); C07D 235/08 (2013.01); C07D 235/26 (2013.01); C07D 241/16 (2013.01); C07D 249/04 (2013.01); C07D 263/56 (2013.01); C07D 263/58 (2013.01); C07D 277/62 (2013.01); C07D 277/64 (2013.01); C07D 295/13 (2013.01); C07D 295/155 (2013.01); C07D 295/185 (2013.01); C07D 295/205 (2013.01); C07D 295/215 (2013.01); C07D 295/26 (2013.01); C07D 307/14 (2013.01); C07D 317/54 (2013.01); C07D 333/28 (2013.01); C07D 333/68 (2013.01); C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/04 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01); C07D 451/02 (2013.01); C07C 2601/08 (2017.05); C07C 2601/14 (2017.05); C07C 2601/16 (2017.05); C07C 2601/18 (2017.05); C07C 2602/08 (2017.05); C07C 2602/10 (2017.05); C07C 2602/28 (2017.05); C07C 2602/42 (2017.05); C07C 2602/44 (2017.05); C07C 2603/74 (2017.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224636A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224636 A2 20020328; WO 0224636 A3 20020926; AR 031130 A1 20030910; AT 317382 T 20060215; AU 9115101 A 20020402; BR 0110101 A 20050607; BR PI0110101 B1 20160823; CA 2423103 A1 20020328; CA 2423103 C 20100824; DE 60117157 D1 20060420; DE 60117157 T2 20060921; DK 1318978 T3 20060606; EP 1318978 A2 20030618; EP 1318978 B1 20060208; ES 2258102 T3 20060816; HK 1058031 A1 20070112; JP 2004529852 A 20040930; JP 5086513 B2 20121128; MX PA03002477 A 20040910; PT 1318978 E 20060630; UY 26942 A1 20020426

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170920

2018-04-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170920

2018-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-04-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170930

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-11-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ABBVIE INC., US

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABBVIE INC. (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELAWARE), US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBOTT PARK, US

- Document: DE 60117157

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABBVIE INC. (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELAWARE), NOR, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBOTT PARK, ILL., US

- Document: DE 60117157

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60117157

- Representative's name: SCHIEBER - FARAGO, DE

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60117157

- Representative's name: FARAGO PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ABBVIE INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, US

2013-09-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130815 AND 20130821

2013-09-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60117157

- Representative's name: SCHIEBER - FARAGO, DE

2013-08-28 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130819

2013-06-28 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ABBVIE INC.

- Effective date: 20130624

2013-06-28 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ABBVIE INC.

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-04-24 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ABBVIE INC., US

- Effective date: 20130410

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ABBOTT LABORATORIES

- Free text: ABBOTT LABORATORIES#D377/AP6D 100 ABBOTT PARK ROAD#ABBOTT PARK, IL 60064-6050 (US) -TRANSFER TO- ABBOTT LABORATORIES#D377/AP6D 100 ABBOTT PARK ROAD#ABBOTT PARK, IL 60064-6050 (US)

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2007-01-12 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1058031

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2258102 T3

2006-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-06-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2006-05-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060401182

2006-05-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60117157 P 20060420

2006-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCCLELLAN, WILLIAM

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OOST, THORSTEN

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRUNCKO, MILAN

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WANG, XILU

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AUGERI, DAVID, J.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUMEISTER, STEVEN, A.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DICKMAN, DANIEL, A.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DING, HONG

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DINGES, JURGEN

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FESIK, STEPHEN, W.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAJDUK, PHILIP, J.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUNZER, AARON, R.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NETTESHEIM, DAVID, G.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETROS, ANDREW, M.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSENBERG, SAUL, H.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHEN, WANG

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THOMAS, SHEELA, A.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WENDT, MICHAEL, D.

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 311/51 A

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 317/28 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 323/12 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 323/17 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 323/25 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 323/30 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 323/37 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 323/58 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 323/60 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 209/08 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 209/96 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 213/61 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 213/70 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 215/48 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 221/20 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 263/56 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 277/62 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 277/64 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 295/14 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 295/20 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 333/28 B

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI