Global Patent Index - EP 1318980 A2

EP 1318980 A2 2003-06-18 - HYDROXAMATE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

HYDROXAMATE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

HYDROXAMATE-DERIVATE ALS DEACETYLASE INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

DERIVES D'HYDROXAMATE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE DESACETYLASE

Publication

EP 1318980 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01960717 A

Priority

  • EP 0110037 W
  • US 22994300 P
  • US 29223201 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222577A2] The present invention provides hydroxamate compounds of formula (I) which are deacetylase inhibitors. The compounds are suitable for pharmaceutical compositions having anti-proliferative properties.

[origin: WO0222577A2] The present invention provides hydroxamate compounds which are deacetylase inhibitors. The compounds are suitable for pharmaceutical compositions having anti-proliferative properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 209/16; C07C 259/06; C07D 417/12; C07D 403/12; C07D 471/04; C07D 519/00; C07D 295/02; A61K 31/4045; A61K 31/16; A61P 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 243/24 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/166 (2006.01); A61K 31/222 (2006.01); A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/353 (2006.01); A61K 31/36 (2006.01); A61K 31/37 (2006.01); A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/4045 (2006.01); A61K 31/405 (2006.01); A61K 31/41 (2006.01); A61K 31/417 (2006.01); A61K 31/4178 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/4196 (2006.01); A61K 31/422 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/5513 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 259/06 (2006.01); C07D 209/14 (2006.01); C07D 209/16 (2006.01); C07D 209/20 (2006.01); C07D 209/82 (2006.01); C07D 233/54 (2006.01); C07D 233/64 (2006.01); C07D 235/14 (2006.01); C07D 295/14 (2006.01); C07D 295/155 (2006.01); C07D 307/81 (2006.01); C07D 311/68 (2006.01); C07D 317/58 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/06 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/06 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/113 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01); A61P (2006.01); C07C (2006.01); C07D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C04B 35/632 (2013.01); C07C 259/06 (2013.01); C07D 209/16 (2013.01); C07D 233/64 (2013.01); C07D 295/155 (2013.01); C07D 307/81 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222577 A2 20020321; WO 0222577 A3 20020906; AR 035057 A1 20040414; AT 376999 T 20071115; AU 2001282129 B2 20050825; AU 8212901 A 20020326; BR 0113669 A 20030603; BR PI0113669 B1 20170606; CA 2420899 A1 20020321; CA 2420899 C 20110308; CN 1300110 C 20070214; CN 1450991 A 20031022; CY 1107839 T1 20130619; CZ 20030573 A3 20030618; CZ 302707 B6 20110914; DE 60131179 D1 20071213; DE 60131179 T2 20080306; DK 1318980 T3 20080211; EC SP034492 A 20030425; EP 1318980 A2 20030618; EP 1318980 B1 20071031; EP 1870399 A1 20071226; ES 2292610 T3 20080316; HK 1057746 A1 20080425; HU 0300880 A2 20030828; HU 0300880 A3 20100329; HU 229796 B1 20140728; HU S1500068 I1 20180502; IL 154574 A 20100217; IL 154574 D0 20030917; JP 2004509105 A 20040325; JP 4012819 B2 20071121; KR 100585484 B1 20060607; KR 20030031986 A 20030423; LU 92890 I2 20160201; MX PA03001832 A 20030604; MY 136892 A 20081128; NL 300778 I2 20160630; NO 20030867 A 20030225; NO 20030867 D0 20030225; NO 2015026 I1 20151228; NO 2015026 I2 20151210; NO 324942 B1 20080107; NZ 524365 A 20041126; PE 03542002 A1 20020612; PL 221738 B1 20160531; PL 361408 A1 20041004; PT 1318980 E 20080117; RU 2302408 C2 20070710; RU 2302408 C3 20180601; SI 1318980 T1 20080831; SK 2422003 A3 20030911; SK 287609 B6 20110405; TW I286544 B 20070911; US 2003018062 A1 20030123; US 2004024067 A1 20040205; US 2005085507 A1 20050421; US 2006189674 A1 20060824; US 2008176849 A1 20080724; US 6552065 B2 20030422; US 6833384 B2 20041221; US 7067551 B2 20060627; ZA 200301423 B 20040421

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-15 [REG AT SPCG] GRANT OF AN SPC

- Document: AT 376999 T

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT ODER EIN PHARMAZEUTISCH AKZEPTABLES SALZ DAVON; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 (MITTEILUNG) 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 72/2015

- Filing date: 20151215

- Expiry date: 20210830

- Extension date: 20260830

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-03-07 [REG IE SPCG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150828

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 2015/066

- Extension date: 20260829

- Effective date: 20180208

2018-02-28 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170815

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-30 [REG DK CTFG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) ISSUED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT ELLER ET FARMACEUTISK ACCEPTABELT SALT DERAF, HERUNDER PANOBINOSTATLAKTAT; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: CR 2015 00068

- Filing date: 20151209

- Expiry date: 20210830

- Extension date: 20260830

2017-09-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170808

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-06 [REG SE SPCG] GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTTHEREOF; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 1590070-7

- Expiry date: 20210831

- Extension date: 20260830

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-06 [REG NL SPCG] GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT, DESGEWENST IN DE VORM VAN EEN FARMACEUTISCH AANVAARDBAAR ZOUT; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 300778

- Filing date: 20151130

- Expiry date: 20210829

- Extension date: 20260829

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-10 [REG FR AV] OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-06-03 [REG FR CT] GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FOR MEDICINE (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OU UN DE SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 15C0086

- Filing date: 20151208

- Extension date: 20260829

2016-05-31 [REG CH SPCF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 61878 23.12.2015

2016-02-15 [REG AT SPCF] FILING AN SPC

- Document: AT 376999 T

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT ODER EIN PHARMAZEUTISCH AKZEPTABLES SALZ ODER EIN DERIVAT DAVON; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 (VEROEFFENTLICHT IM AMTSBLATT DER EU: 01.09.2015) 20150828

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 72/2015

- Filing date: 20151215

- Effective date: 20160215

2016-02-01 [REG LU CCP] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINSTAT OU UN SEL PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLE , OU UN DERIVE DE CELUI-CI (FARYDAK); FIRST REGISTRATION: 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 92890

- Filing date: 20151201

- Extension date: 20260830

2016-01-13 [REG GB CTFF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF.; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC/GB15/085

- Filing date: 20151218

2016-01-11 [REG DK CTFF] APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT ELLER ET FARMACEUTISK SALT ELLER DERIVAT DERAF; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: CA 2015 00068

- Filing date: 20151209

- Expiry date: 20210830

- Extension date: 20260830

2016-01-05 [REG SE SPCF] APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT, OR DERIVATIVE THEREOF; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 1590070-7

2015-12-30 [REG IE SPCF] REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT, OR DERIVATIVE THEREOF; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150828

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 2015/066

- Filing date: 20151209

2015-12-16 [REG NL SPCF] APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT, DESGEWENST IN DE VORM VAN EEN FARMACEUTISCH AANVAARDBAAR ZOUT OF DERIVAAT DAARVAN; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 300778

- Filing date: 20151130

- Expiry date: 20210829

- Extension date: 20260829

2015-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG, CH

- Document: AT 376999 T

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-12-15 [REG DE R065] REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT ODER EIN PHARMAZEUTISCH ANNEHMBARES SALZ ODER DERIVAT HIERVON; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150828

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 122015000098

- Filing date: 20151202

- Expiry date: 20210831

2015-12-08 [REG FR CP] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OU UN DE SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES,OU UN DE LEURS DERIVES; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150828

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 15C0086

- Filing date: 20151208

2015-12-08 [REG FR CP] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: PANOBINOSTAT OU UN DE SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1023 20150901

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 15C0086

- Filing date: 20151208

2015-12-02 [REG FI SPCF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C20150057

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60131179

2010-07-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20100320

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080830

2008-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MUNDIPHARMA GMBH

2008-09-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MUNDIPHARMA GMBH

- Effective date: 20080731

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-25 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1057746

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2292610 T3

2008-02-11 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2008-02-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070403799

2008-01-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-01-17 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60131179 P 20071213

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031106

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-12-03 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020906

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI