Global Patent Index - EP 1319050 A2

EP 1319050 A2 2003-06-18 - LIQUID ADDITIVE SPRAY INJECTION TO POLYMERIC POWDERS

Title (en)

LIQUID ADDITIVE SPRAY INJECTION TO POLYMERIC POWDERS

Title (de)

EINSPRITZUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN ADDITIVEN IN POLYMERPULVER

Title (fr)

INJECTION D'ADDITIF LIQUIDE EN PULVERISATION A DES POUDRES POLYMERES

Publication

EP 1319050 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01968820 A

Priority

  • US 0128515 W
  • US 23297200 P
  • US 23378000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222747A2] An improved method and apparatus for adding relatively small amounts of one or more liquid additives to powder coating composition where the liquid is sprayed onto granular or particulate components of the powder composition during mechanical mixing to blend the components before further homogenizing by a melt mixing process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 5/03; C08J 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/20 (2006.01); C09D 5/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/203 (2013.01); C09D 5/033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222747A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222747 A2 20020321; WO 0222747 A3 20020530; CA 2422302 A1 20020321; EP 1319050 A2 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030702

2004-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT GB

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR