Global Patent Index - EP 1319067 A2

EP 1319067 A2 2003-06-18 - HUMAN COAGULATION FACTOR VII VARIANTS

Title (en)

HUMAN COAGULATION FACTOR VII VARIANTS

Title (de)

VARIANTEN DES MENSCHLICHEN KOAGULATIONSFAKTORS VII

Title (fr)

VARIANTS DU FACTEUR VII DE COAGULATION HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1319067 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01967077 A

Priority

  • DK 0100596 W
  • DK PA200001361 A
  • US 23645500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222776A2] The present invention relates to novel human coagulation Factor VIIa variants having coagulant activity as well as nucleic acid constructs encoding such variants, vectors and host cells comprising and expressing the nucleic acid, pharmaceutical compositions, uses and methods of treatment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/64; A61K 38/48; C07K 14/745

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01H 1/00 (2006.01); A01K 67/00 (2006.01); A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/36 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 41/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/745 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C07K (2006.01); C12N (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/647 (2013.01); A61K 38/4846 (2013.01); C12N 9/6437 (2013.01); C12Y 304/21021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222776A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222776 A2 20020321; WO 0222776 A3 20020718; WO 0222776 A9 20030522; AU 2001287550 B2 20070322; AU 8755001 A 20020326; EP 1319067 A2 20030618; EP 2226385 A1 20100908; EP 2226385 B1 20130710; EP 2253703 A1 20101124; HU 0301246 A2 20030828; HU 0301246 A3 20051228; IL 154520 A 20100616; IL 154520 D0 20030917; IL 196482 A 20110331; IL 206229 A 20120229; JP 2004508822 A 20040325; JP 2009278980 A 20091203; JP 4361728 B2 20091111; JP 4814359 B2 20111116; PL 204888 B1 20100226; PL 360384 A1 20040906

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-22 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130416

2013-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVO NORDISK HEALTH CARE AG

2010-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PERSSON, EGON

2010-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OLSEN, OLE, HVILSTED

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061107

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVO NORDISK HEALTH CARE AG

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PERSSON, EGON

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OLSEN, OLE, HVILSTED

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI