Global Patent Index - EP 1319093 A2

EP 1319093 A2 2003-06-18 - ELECTROPLATING SOLUTIONS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TERNARY TIN ZINC COBALT ALLOY LAYERS

Title (en)

ELECTROPLATING SOLUTIONS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TERNARY TIN ZINC COBALT ALLOY LAYERS

Title (de)

GALVANISCHE ELEKTROLYTBÄDER ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON TERNÄREN ZINN-ZINK-KOBALT LEGIERUNGSSCHICHTEN

Title (fr)

BAINS DE GALVANISATION PERMETTANTS DE FORMER DES COUCHES D'ALLIAGE TERNAIRE ETAIN-ZINC-COBALT

Publication

EP 1319093 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01969597 A

Priority

  • DE 10045991 A
  • EP 0109452 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222913A2] The invention relates to ternary tin zinc alloy coatings 30 - 65 wt. % tin, 30 - 65 wt. % zinc and 0.1 - 15 wt . % metal from the following group as a third alloy component; iron, cobalt, nickel. Correspondingly, alloy coatings can be produced by means of electrolytic deposition from aqueous galvanic electroplating solutions which contain the components of the alloy in a dissolved form. The alloy coatings are characterised in that they have a particularly high resistance to corrosion and are particularly suitable as anti-corrosion protective coatings on iron-based materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/56; C22C 13/00; C22C 18/00; C25D 3/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 13/00 (2006.01); C22C 18/00 (2006.01); C25D 3/56 (2006.01); C25D 3/60 (2006.01); C25D 5/26 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/565 (2013.01); C22C 13/00 (2013.01); C22C 18/00 (2013.01); C25D 3/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222913A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222913 A2 20020321; WO 0222913 A3 20020725; CN 1239751 C 20060201; CN 1468327 A 20040114; DE 10045991 A1 20020404; DE 50114623 D1 20090212; EP 1319093 A2 20030618; EP 1319093 B1 20081231; HK 1054576 A1 20090717; JP 2004509229 A 20040325; JP 4817352 B2 20111116; US 2004091385 A1 20040513

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140816

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114623

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140816

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114623

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130814

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130808

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130814

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-12-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-07-17 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1054576

2009-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114623 P 20090212

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-12-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-08-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-07-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTROPLATING SOLUTIONS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TERNARY TIN ZINC COBALT ALLOY LAYERS

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR