Global Patent Index - EP 1319110 A1

EP 1319110 A1 2003-06-18 - LARGE-SCALE MANIPULATOR COMPRISING A VIBRATION DAMPER

Title (en)

LARGE-SCALE MANIPULATOR COMPRISING A VIBRATION DAMPER

Title (de)

GROSSMANIPULATOR MIT SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER

Title (fr)

GRAND MANIPULATEUR POURVU D'UN AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS

Publication

EP 1319110 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01945335 A

Priority

  • DE 10046546 A
  • EP 0107617 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225036A1] The invention relates to a large-scale manipulator, especially of concrete pumps. Said large-scale manipulator has a bending mast (22) which consists of at least three mast arms (23 to 27) and which is preferably configured as a concrete spreader mast. The arms of said mast are each pivotable to a limited extent about horizontal, bending axes (28 to 32) which are parallel to each other, by means of a drive aggregate (34 to 38), respectively. A control device (50, 62, 52) for moving the mast with the help of actuating mechanisms that are allocated to the individual drive aggregates, and means for damping mechanical vibrations in the bending mast are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/18 (2013.01); B66C 13/066 (2013.01); E04G 21/04 (2013.01); E04G 21/0436 (2013.01); E04G 21/0454 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20018 (2013.01); Y10T 137/0318 (2015.04); Y10T 137/8807 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225036A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225036 A1 20020328; AT 390530 T 20080415; AT 471416 T 20100715; DE 10046546 A1 20020328; DE 20122093 U1 20040325; DE 50113790 C5 20170302; DE 50113790 D1 20080508; DE 50115523 C5 20161103; DE 50115523 D1 20100729; EP 1319110 A1 20030618; EP 1319110 B1 20080326; EP 1319110 B8 20080709; EP 1882795 A2 20080130; EP 1882795 A3 20090422; EP 1882795 B1 20100616; ES 2301552 T3 20080701; ES 2344612 T3 20100901; JP 2004510077 A 20040402; JP 4580617 B2 20101117; KR 100800798 B1 20080204; KR 20030040465 A 20030522; US 2003196506 A1 20031023; US 6883532 B2 20050426

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-02 [REG DE R206] AMENDED PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: DE 50113790

2016-11-21 [REG DE R043] PATENT'S REVOCATION IN PART NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50113790

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140705

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140704

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-04-23 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 50113790

- Effective date: 20150223

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140704

2015-02-23 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 50113790

2015-02-23 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 50113790

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-06-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER ENGINEERING GMBH

- Effective date: 20110610

2011-02-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110113 AND 20110119

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080627

2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-03-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080626

2008-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2301552 T3

2008-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER CONCRETE PUMPS GMBH

- Effective date: 20080402

2008-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080424

2008-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113790 P 20080508

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-04-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER CONCRETE PUMPS GMBH

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070831

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020411

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR