Global Patent Index - EP 1319113 A1

EP 1319113 A1 2003-06-18 - MECHANISM FOR MANOEUVRING A DOOR

Title (en)

MECHANISM FOR MANOEUVRING A DOOR

Title (de)

TÜRBETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE MANOEUVRE DE PORTE

Publication

EP 1319113 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01974387 A

Priority

  • FR 0102927 W
  • FR 0012033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225041A1] The invention concerns a mechanism for manoeuvring a door more particularly designed to be associated with a bar for avoiding panic. Said mechanism comprises a pivoting bolt (26) provided with a slot wherewith it can co-operate with a lock-bolt keeper, a pivoting cam (35) for preventing the bolt from rotating towards a so-called loose escaping position and a member actuating (45) the cam to release the bolt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05B 15/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 63/12 (2006.01); E05C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/1046 (2013.01); E05B 15/102 (2013.01); E05B 17/2084 (2013.01); E05B 63/12 (2013.01); E05C 3/24 (2013.01); Y10T 292/0947 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225041 A1 20020328; AU 9391501 A 20020402; CA 2423693 A1 20020328; CZ 20030920 A3 20030813; EP 1319113 A1 20030618; FR 2814190 A1 20020322; FR 2814190 B1 20030829; IL 154923 D0 20031031; JP 2004510078 A 20040402; MX PA03002457 A 20040910; PL 360617 A1 20040920; RU 2003111153 A 20040827; RU 2289663 C2 20061220; SK 4572003 A3 20031007; US 2004021324 A1 20040205

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1054066

2007-04-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061017

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040913

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FONTENEAU, BERTRAND

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ACHERON, THIERRY

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAILLIA-PREL, QUENTIN

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERGER, PASCAL

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNARD, THIERRY

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIJON, JEAN-PAUL

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COLTEL, GILLES

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LECOINTE, XAVIER

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SALLET, ERIC

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR