Global Patent Index - EP 1319117 A1

EP 1319117 A1 2003-06-18 - METHOD FOR REGULATING A STEAM TURBINE, AND CORRESPONDING STEAM TURBINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGULATING A STEAM TURBINE, AND CORRESPONDING STEAM TURBINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINER DAMPFTURBINE UND DAMPFTURBINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGULATION D'UNE TURBINE A VAPEUR ET TURBINE A VAPEUR CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1319117 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01983470 A

Priority

  • EP 01983470 A
  • EP 0110358 W
  • EP 00120574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1191190A1] The method of governing a steam turbine entails feeding steam through at least three valves, whereby one of the valves (9,11) is operated as a regulating valve and at least two (13,15) as control valves which are electric motor actuated. The valve block may comprise two regulating valves and two control valves. An Independent claim is included for a steam turbine with a valve block to control steam inlet and which comprises a regulating valve and at least two control valves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 17/14; F01D 17/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/24 (2006.01); F01D 17/14 (2006.01); F01D 17/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/18 (2013.01); F01D 17/145 (2013.01); F05D 2220/31 (2013.01); F05D 2270/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225067A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191190 A1 20020327; CN 100335751 C 20070905; CN 1461374 A 20031210; DE 50115502 D1 20100715; EP 1319117 A1 20030618; EP 1319117 B1 20100602; ES 2344591 T3 20100901; JP 2004518050 A 20040617; JP 4695822 B2 20110608; WO 0225067 A1 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140908

2015-10-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151029

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140907

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140907

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140907

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115502

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131004

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50115502

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2344591 T3

2010-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115502 P 20100715

2010-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2010-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070807

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR