Global Patent Index - EP 1319120 A1

EP 1319120 A1 2003-06-18 - FIXED-FLOATING MOUNTING FOR A CATALYST SUPPORT ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

FIXED-FLOATING MOUNTING FOR A CATALYST SUPPORT ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

FEST- LOS-LAGERUNG EINES KATALYSATOR-TRÄGERKÖRPERS

Title (fr)

MONTAGE D'UN ENSEMBLE CATALYSEUR-SUPPORT AU MOYEN D'UN PALIER FIXE ET D'UN PALIER LIBRE

Publication

EP 1319120 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01985283 A

Priority

  • DE 10046610 A
  • EP 0110618 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225076A1] The invention relates to a system for fixing a catalyst support assembly (1) in a housing (2). Said catalyst support assembly (1) comprises a cladding pipe (3) and a honeycomb structure, through which an exhaust gas permeates (4). The cladding pipe (3) has at least a first (5) and a second convex section (6) comprising flanks (15) and is connected to the honeycomb structure (4) at least in one part (7). The housing (2) has at least a first (8) and second recess (9) with lateral faces (16). The system is characterised in that the convex sections (5, 6) extend partially into the recesses (8, 9) in such a way that a fixed mounting (20) and at least one floating mounting (21) with axial (10) play (11) are formed. Said system guarantees that the catalyst support is permanently fixed, in particular during the structural vibrations that occur in the exhaust system of an internal combustion engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/86 (2006.01); B01J 33/00 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2853 (2013.01); F01N 3/2839 (2013.01); F01N 3/2864 (2013.01); F01N 13/1888 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225076A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225076 A1 20020328; AU 2354302 A 20020402; DE 10046610 C1 20020425; EP 1319120 A1 20030618; EP 1319120 B1 20040331; JP 2004509278 A 20040325; US 2003180198 A1 20030925; US 7258842 B2 20070821

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101869

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120914

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101869 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRUECK, ROLF

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAUS, WOLFGANG

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KONIECZNY, KATRIN

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KONIECZNY, JOERG-ROMAN

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRUECK, ROLF

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAUS, WOLFGANG

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KONIECZNY, KATRIN

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KONIECZNY, JOERG-ROMAN

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI