Global Patent Index - EP 1319127 A1

EP 1319127 A1 2003-06-18 - VALVE CONFIGURATION FOR CONTROL VALVES

Title (en)

VALVE CONFIGURATION FOR CONTROL VALVES

Title (de)

VENTILAUSBILDUNG FÜR STEUERVENTILE

Title (fr)

CONFIGURATION DE SOUPAPES DE DISTRIBUTION

Publication

EP 1319127 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01978375 A

Priority

  • DE 10046416 A
  • EP 0110685 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223036A1] The invention relates to a valve configuration for control valves. Said valve configuration operates by means of graduated throttling using throttling points (5) which are arranged in the supply on the high pressure side (2) and in the discharge on the low pressure side (17). Said throttling is carried out by a blocking element (7, 32, 36) in order to avoid cavitation erosion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46; F02M 47/02; F02M 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 63/0071 (2013.01); F02M 63/0077 (2013.01); F02M 2200/04 (2013.01); F02M 2200/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223036A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223036 A1 20020321; AT 319003 T 20060315; DE 10046416 A1 20020411; DE 10046416 C2 20021107; DE 50109103 D1 20060427; EP 1319127 A1 20030618; EP 1319127 B1 20060301

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090915

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090915

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090915

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090915

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109103 P 20060427

2006-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI GB LI

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI GB LI

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FI GB LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR