Global Patent Index - EP 1319128 A1

EP 1319128 A1 2003-06-18 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1319128 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01957756 A

Priority

  • DE 0102986 W
  • DE 10044933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223037A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve comprising a valve body (3), inside of which a boring (7) is provided that has a plunger-like valve element (10) arranged therein. Said valve element (10) can be longitudinally displaced inside the boring (7) counter to a closing force and uses its longitudinal movement to control at least one injection opening (22) through which the fuel can be injected into the combustion chamber of the internal combustion engine. The tensioning of the valve retaining body (1) against the valve body (3) is effected by means of a tensioning nut (5), which surrounds the valve body (3) and, with an internal threading (44), engages inside an external threading (42) provided on the valve retaining body (1). The bearing flank (52) of the external threading (42) and the bearing flank (50) of the internal threading (44), which are pressed against one another by the tensioning, are perpendicular to the longitudinal axis (8) of the external threading (42) thereby preventing the exertion of outwardly directed radial forces onto the tensioning nut (5) while the tensioning nut (5) is tightened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 2200/8076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223037A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223037 A1 20020321; DE 10044933 A1 20020321; DE 50111561 D1 20070111; EP 1319128 A1 20030618; EP 1319128 B1 20061129; JP 2004509268 A 20040325; US 2003132318 A1 20030717; US 6712295 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180301

2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2018-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111561

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061129

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061129

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-06-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061129

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111561 P 20070111

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT TR

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061129

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT TR

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR