Global Patent Index - EP 1319131 A1

EP 1319131 A1 2003-06-18 - COMPOUND FRICTION VACUUM PUMP

Title (en)

COMPOUND FRICTION VACUUM PUMP

Title (de)

COMPOUND-REIBUNGSVAKUUMPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A VIDE A FRICTION COMPOSEE

Publication

EP 1319131 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01974147 A

Priority

  • DE 10046766 A
  • EP 0109194 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0227189A1] The invention relates to a friction vacuum pump (1) comprising at least one turbomolecular pump stage, with a molecular pump stage that is subsequently connected on the pressure side, and with a transition stage mounted between the turbomolecular pump stage and the molecular pump stage. In order to improve the transition from the turbomolecular zone to the molecular zone, the transition stage has a flow section that is continuously tapered in the tangential direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04D 29/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/04 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/042 (2013.01); F04D 29/544 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227189A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0227189 A1 20020404; DE 10046766 A1 20020411; DE 50114375 D1 20081113; EP 1319131 A1 20030618; EP 1319131 B1 20081001; JP 2004510100 A 20040402; US 2004033130 A1 20040219; US 6890146 B2 20050510

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100809

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114375

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100809

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100809

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090702

2008-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2008-11-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: OERLIKON LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH

- Free text: LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH#BONNER STRASSE 498#50968 KOELN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- OERLIKON LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH#BONNER STRASSE 498#50968 KOELN (DE)

2008-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114375 P 20081113

2008-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071031

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLUMENTHAL, ROLAND

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUNDERTMARK, STEPHAN

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLUMENTHAL, ROLAND

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUNDERTMARK, STEFAN

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR