Global Patent Index - EP 1319185 A1

EP 1319185 A1 2003-06-18 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING COMPOUNDS WITH ANTI-HERPES ACTIVITY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING COMPOUNDS WITH ANTI-HERPES ACTIVITY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN MIT ANTI-HERPES WIRKSAMKEIT

Title (fr)

METHODES D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSES PRESENTANT UNE ACTIVITE ANTIHERPES

Publication

EP 1319185 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00945756 A

Priority

EP 0005509 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0196874A1] The invention relates to a method for identifying compounds with antiviral activity, characterized in that those compounds are selected in the presence of which resistant viral mutants can be selected, wherein at least one selected viral mutant carries at least one mutation in the primase gene and another selected viral mutant carries at least one mutation in the helicase gene or a selected viral mutant carries at least one mutation in the helicase and at least one mutation in the primase gene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/569; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 277/54 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/502 (2013.01); C07D 277/54 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01); G01N 33/5008 (2013.01); G01N 2333/035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0196874A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0196874 A1 20011220; AU 5973400 A 20011224; CA 2412720 A1 20011220; EP 1319185 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050705

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050221

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KLEYMANN, GERALD

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KLEYMANN, GERALD

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI