Global Patent Index - EP 1319219 A1

EP 1319219 A1 2003-06-18 - METHOD FOR PREVENTING COUNTERFEITING OR ALTERATION OF A PRINTED OR ENGRAVED SURFACE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREVENTING COUNTERFEITING OR ALTERATION OF A PRINTED OR ENGRAVED SURFACE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEUGUNG DER VERFÄLSCHUNG ODER ÄNDERUNG VON BEDRUCKTEN ODER GRAVIERTEN FLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DESTINE A PREVENIR LA CONTREFAÇON OU L'ALTERATION D'UNE SURFACE IMPRIMEE OU GRAVEE

Publication

EP 1319219 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01964793 A

Priority

  • CH 0100560 W
  • CH 18322000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225599A1] The invention concerns a method for preventing counterfeiting or alteration of a printed or engraved surface, characterised in that it consists in incorporating a signature in the form of a digital watermark in part of or in the entire document, and in particular using a technique of digital watermark enabling to mask invisible data by overstriking using the technique known as asymmetric amplitude modulation. Said technique can be applied to all types of printed material such as paper, packages or any other surface. Visible data can also be printed over the watermark. For example, a paper document comprising such a watermark enables to guarantee its authenticity for any copying eliminates the signature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/004 (2016.01); G07D 7/005 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/004 (2013.01); G07D 7/0056 (2017.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225599 A1 20020328; AT 488822 T 20101215; CN 1252653 C 20060419; CN 1475001 A 20040211; DE 60143487 D1 20101230; DK 1319219 T3 20110221; EP 1319219 A1 20030618; EP 1319219 B1 20101117; EP 2261867 A2 20101215; EP 2261867 A3 20121219; ES 2356598 T3 20110411; US 2004013285 A1 20040122; US 7684088 B2 20100323

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170906

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110917

2013-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60143487

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110218

2011-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-04-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2356598 T3

- Effective date: 20110411

2011-03-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-02-23 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-02-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LEMAN CONSULTING S.A.

2010-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60143487 P 20101230

2010-12-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JORDAN, FREDERIC

2010-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEYLAN, ROLAND

2010-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUTTER, MARTIN

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061009

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR