Global Patent Index - EP 1319235 A1

EP 1319235 A1 2003-06-18 - SOLENOID PLUNGER SYSTEM COMPRISING AN IMPACT DAMPING MECHANISM

Title (en)

SOLENOID PLUNGER SYSTEM COMPRISING AN IMPACT DAMPING MECHANISM

Title (de)

TAUCHANKERSYSTEM MIT ANSCHLAGDÄMPFUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE INDUIT PLONGEUR A ARRET AMORTI

Publication

EP 1319235 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969724 A

Priority

  • DE 10046939 A
  • EP 0110701 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225676A1] The invention relates to a solenoid plunger system (1) for an electropneumatic pressure transducer. Said system comprises the following elements, all situated at least partially in a casing (14), in particular an iron casing: a solenoid plunger (10); a core (16, 20) such as an iron core or a magnetic core; at least one first cavity (12) in the solenoid plunger and/or a second cavity (18) in the core (16); an air-gap (32) between the casing and the solenoid plunger and/or the core, said gap being adjusted by the relative movement of the solenoid plunger and the core, during which the solenoid plunger can be at least partially introduced into and removed from the second cavity (18) in the core and/or the core (20) can be at least partially introduced into and removed from the first cavity in the solenoid plunger; and a first damping member (28) in the first cavity and/or a second damping member (30) in the second cavity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225676A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225676 A1 20020328; WO 0225676 A8 20020725; DE 10046939 A1 20020502; DE 10046939 B4 20040826; EP 1319235 A1 20030618; EP 1319235 B1 20040225; JP 2004510327 A 20040402; US 2003178594 A1 20030925; US 6913242 B2 20050705

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101570

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101570 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WOCO INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR