Global Patent Index - EP 1319260 A1

EP 1319260 A1 2003-06-18 - COPLANAR WAVEGUIDE SWITCH

Title (en)

COPLANAR WAVEGUIDE SWITCH

Title (de)

KOPLANARER WELLENLEITERSCHALTER

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR DE GUIDE D'ONDES COPLANAIRE

Publication

EP 1319260 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01955268 A

Priority

  • DE 0102757 W
  • DE 10037385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0211232A1] The invention relates to a device comprising a capacitor (200) for altering the impedance of a section of a coplanar waveguide. According to the invention, the capacitance of the capacitor (200) can be altered, the signal line (120) of the section of the waveguide is interrupted at a predetermined length (122), a first connection (130) connects the grounding lines (110, 111) of the waveguide, and the second connection (121) connects both parts of the interrupted signal line (120).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/12 (2006.01); H01P 3/02 (2006.01); H01H 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/127 (2013.01); H01H 59/0009 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0211232A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0211232 A1 20020207; DE 10037385 A1 20020214; DE 50114251 D1 20081002; EP 1319260 A1 20030618; EP 1319260 B1 20080820; JP 2004505578 A 20040219; US 2003030505 A1 20030213; US 6686810 B2 20040203

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114251

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130720

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110720

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110720

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090525

2008-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114251 P 20081002

2008-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-06-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-08-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070713

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR