Global Patent Index - EP 1319262 A1

EP 1319262 A1 2003-06-18 - ELECTRICAL TERMINAL SOCKET ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICULAR COMPONENT

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL TERMINAL SOCKET ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICULAR COMPONENT

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE ANSCHLUSSBUCHSENANORDNUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DOUILLE TERMINALE POUR COMPOSANTS DE VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1319262 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01970860 A

Priority

  • US 0128508 W
  • US 23269800 P
  • US 27177601 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223678A1] A terminal socket assembly (10) for interconnecting electrically powered vehicular components with an associated input male input pin (12) and an output cable (14). The socket assembly includes a spring cage blank (18) having first (40) and second (42) extending edges and a plurality of spaced apart and angled beams (44) extending between the edges. The spring cage is formed into a substantially cylindrical shape, and particularly in an "hourglass shape", configuration utilizing any of a variety of different forming and bending operations. A substantially tubular sleeve (118) is provided for receiving the configured spring cage in axially inserting fashion. The sleeve is compressingly engageable, such as by forming an axially extending slit along the length of the sleeve with a predetermined incremental amount of spacing established between adjoining surfaces, and in order to create an interference fit with the axially inserted spring cage. The assembled sleeve and spring cage is capable of biasingly receiving and engaging an extending and inserting portion of the male pin (12). Gripping portions (130, 132) are integrally secured to the tubular sleeve and fixedly engage an extending end of a cable (14) to electrically communicate the two cables. A sealed connector housing forms a part of and encases the terminal socket assembly and extending connector cables and includes assembleable male and female housing portions and end seals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 11/22 (2006.01); H01R 13/187 (2006.01); H01R 43/048 (2006.01); H01R 43/058 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/22 (2013.01); H01R 13/187 (2013.01); H01R 4/184 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49195 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223678A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223678 A1 20020321; WO 0223678 A8 20020725; WO 0223678 A9 20030403; AU 9081401 A 20020326; BR 0113903 A 20030722; CA 2422469 A1 20020321; CN 100452557 C 20090114; CN 1511361 A 20040707; DE 60137781 D1 20090409; EP 1319262 A1 20030618; EP 1319262 B1 20090225; EP 2053700 A2 20090429; EP 2053700 A3 20090923; HK 1064808 A1 20091023; HU 0302611 A2 20031128; HU 0302611 A3 20040329; JP 2004509440 A 20040325; KR 100798820 B1 20080128; KR 20030046450 A 20030612; MX PA03002339 A 20031015; US 2002049006 A1 20020425; US 2005164566 A1 20050728; US 6875063 B2 20050405; US 7115003 B2 20061003

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60137781

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEES INC. (N.D.GESETZEN DES STAATES DELAWARE), US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AEES INC., FRANKLIN, US

- Document: DE 60137781

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137781

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG, DE

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137781

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-03-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137781

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG, DE

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121003

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEES INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALCOA FUJIKURA LTD., FRANKLIN, US

- Document: DE 60137781

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEES INC. (N.D.GESETZEN DES STAATES DELAWARE), US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALCOA FUJIKURA LTD., FRANKLIN, US

- Document: DE 60137781

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137781

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG, DE

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137781

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137781

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-06-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60137781 P 20090409

2009-04-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060614

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI