Global Patent Index - EP 1319297 A2

EP 1319297 A2 2003-06-18 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR INTERACTIVE COMMUNICATIONS

Title (en)

METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR INTERACTIVE COMMUNICATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTERAKTIVEN KOMMUNIKATIONS

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET APPAREIL POUR COMMUNICATIONS INTERACTIVES AVEC DU PERSONNEL D'ENTRETIEN ET D'ASSISTANCE

Publication

EP 1319297 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01967491 A

Priority

  • GB 0104140 W
  • US 66878500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225319A2] In one aspect, a method of communicating between an on-site location and an off-site location is provided. The method comprising providing a communications attachment that can be positioned at the on-site location. A 2 or more-way communication system is established between the on-site location and the off-site location. The actions of the on-site location are remotely monitored by input from the off-site location. In another aspect, an apparatus comprises an off-site service computer, a communications attachment, and a communications system. The communications attachment is positioned an on-site location. A communication system between the communications attachment and the off-site service computer. In one aspect, the communications attachment is secured to a hardhat. One aspect of the communications attachment provides for communication between a person located on-site and an off-site service person for failure analysis of a complex system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 41/00 (2006.01); E21B 44/00 (2006.01); E21B 47/12 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/185 (2013.01); E21B 44/00 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 67/12 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225319A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225319 A2 20020328; WO 0225319 A3 20030116; AU 8786601 A 20020402; CA 2423586 A1 20020328; EP 1319297 A2 20030618; NO 20030338 A 20030514; NO 20030338 D0 20030123; NO 20055380 A 20030514

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100316

2009-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091105

2005-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.

2005-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LONGBOTTOM, JAMES

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI NL

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI