Global Patent Index - EP 1319310 A2

EP 1319310 A2 2003-06-18 - METHOD FOR THE DISCONTINUOUS REGULATION AND TRANSMISSION OF THE LUMINANCE AND/OR CHROMINANCE COMPONENT IN DIGITAL IMAGE SIGNAL TRANSMISSION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE DISCONTINUOUS REGULATION AND TRANSMISSION OF THE LUMINANCE AND/OR CHROMINANCE COMPONENT IN DIGITAL IMAGE SIGNAL TRANSMISSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DISKONTINUIERLICHEN REGELUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNG DER LUMINANZ- UND/ODER CHROMINANZKOMPONENTE IN DER DIGITALEN BILDSIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGULATION ET DE TRANSMISSION DISCONTINUE DES COMPOSANTES LUMINANCE ET/OU CHROMINANCE DANS LA TRANSMISSION NUMERIQUE DE SIGNAUX IMAGE

Publication

EP 1319310 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01971648 A

Priority

  • DE 0103277 W
  • DE 10045777 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223899A2] The invention relates to a method for regulating signal components of at least one data signal (DS) which is transmitted from a signal source (102) to a signal sink (111). The transmission takes place at discrete times according to whether and when there are changes in the data signal (DS) at the transmission end. A special example of embodiment of the invention comprises a method for automatic adjustment of the luminance, chrominance and/or colour saturation values in digital image transmission systems for video signals, for example in the television or multimedia fields. The invention is based on a method for transmitting differential images which are produced by subtraction of the YUV components of frames at scanning times which follow each other in time. According to the invention, these differential images are transmitted at irregular intervals at discrete points in time provided at least one suitably established time, Y, U or V threshold value is exceeded. This provides a means of considerably reducing the redundancy in the transmission signal and therefore, the data transmission rates compared to a periodically repeated differential image transmission.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/26; H03M 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/507 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/507 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223899A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223899 A2 20020321; WO 0223899 A3 20021227; DE 10045777 A1 20020411; EP 1319310 A2 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080219

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERMSEN, MARKUS

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR