Global Patent Index - EP 1319316 A2

EP 1319316 A2 2003-06-18 - RADIO ACCESS NETWORK FOR A MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND AN OPERATING METHOD THEREFOR

Title (en)

RADIO ACCESS NETWORK FOR A MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND AN OPERATING METHOD THEREFOR

Title (de)

FUNKZUGANGSNETZ FÜR EIN MOBILFUNK-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

RESEAU D'ACCES RADIO POUR SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO MOBILE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1319316 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01978109 A

Priority

  • DE 0103473 W
  • DE 10046342 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0228130A2] The invention relates to a radio access network (RAN) for a mobile radio communications system and to an operating method therefor. The radio access network has a number of first nodes (UPS1, UPS2, ), which are each assigned to a subarea (A, a) of a geographical area, and which serve for exchanging useful data between terminals (UE), which are located in the relevant subarea, and a primary network (CN). The radio access network also has at least one second node (RCS1, RCS2), which comprises a number of signaling functionalities (UEF) for exchanging signaling data with the each respective terminal (UE). The second node (RCS1, RCS2, ...) is connected to a number of first nodes (UPS1, UPS2, ...) in order to exchange signaling data with a terminal (UE) via those first nodes (UPS1, UPS2, ...) with which this terminal (UE) exchanges useful data. When the terminal passes into the subarea of another first node, the transmission of useful data shifts from the previous node to this other first node, whereby a shifting of the signaling functionality is unnecessary.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/24; H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/08 (2009.01); H04W 76/04 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/0055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0228130A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0228130 A2 20020404; WO 0228130 A3 20021128; CN 100512539 C 20090708; CN 1475088 A 20040211; DE 10046342 A1 20020404; EP 1319316 A2 20030618; JP 2004511145 A 20040408; US 2004053627 A1 20040318; US 7146177 B2 20061205

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090930

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080604

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR