Global Patent Index - EP 1319321 A2

EP 1319321 A2 2003-06-18 - LOUDSPEAKER DRIVER

Title (en)

LOUDSPEAKER DRIVER

Title (de)

LAUTSPRECHERTREIBER

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE D'UN HAUT-PARLEUR

Publication

EP 1319321 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01972232 A

Priority

  • GB 0103995 W
  • GB 0023134 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225992A2] A module for attachment to a rigid panel and adapted to apply bending wave energy at audio frequencies to the panel can radiate an audio output, comprising a housing adapted to be secured to the panel, foot means on the housing and adapted to fix the housing securely to the panel, an electro-mechanical transducer in the housing, means supporting the transducer in the housing the transducer being adapted to contact the panel to apply bending wave energy thereto when energised with an electrical audio signal, and audio signal amplifying means in the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/06; H04R 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 1/06 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/06 (2013.01); H04R 9/066 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225992A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225992 A2 20020328; WO 0225992 A3 20030103; AU 9201201 A 20020402; CN 1462566 A 20031217; EP 1319321 A2 20030618; EP 1319321 B1 20111207; ES 2378815 T3 20120418; GB 0023134 D0 20001101; JP 2004509542 A 20040325

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130905

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60145763

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130905

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120906

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60145763

- Effective date: 20120910

2012-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120910

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111207

2012-04-18 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2378815 T3

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-03-21 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20111207

2012-01-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60145763

- Effective date: 20120126

2011-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2011-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-04-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1052430

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI