Global Patent Index - EP 1319322 A1

EP 1319322 A1 2003-06-18 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, RECEIVING UNIT, AND HEARING AID

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, RECEIVING UNIT, AND HEARING AID

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMS, ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM, EMPFANGSEINHEIT UND HÖRGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION, UNITÉ DE RECÉPTION, ET APPAREIL AUDITIF

Publication

EP 1319322 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00958086 A

Priority

CH 0000505 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223948A1] The invention relates first to a method for controlling a transmission system consisting of at least one transmitter (S1,... Sn) and at least one receiving unit (1), a signal (SIN) that is transmitted through a service channel (120) being amplitude-, frequency-, and/or phase-modulated. According to the invention, configuration parameters are transmitted to the receiving unit (1) through a control channel (110,, 113). This transmission through the control channel (110,, 113) takes place independently of any transmission that may have taken place through the service channel (120). Based on the configuration parameters that are transmitted, adjustments relating especially to the demodulation of the signal (SIN) that is transmitted through the service channel are made in the receiving unit (1). The invention also relates to an application for the method, to a transmission system, to a receiving unit and to a hearing aid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; H04B 5/00; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/04 (2006.01); H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01); H04R 25/554 (2013.01); H04R 2420/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223948A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223948 A1 20020321; AU 2000269773 B2 20060302; AU 6977300 A 20020326; CA 2422449 A1 20030306; CA 2422449 C 20111122; EP 1319322 A1 20030618; IL 153976 D0 20030731; JP 2004522333 A 20040722

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180215

2015-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONOVA AG

2010-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101005

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI