Global Patent Index - EP 1319346 A1

EP 1319346 A1 2003-06-18 - Sports footwear with variable stiffness

Title (en)

Sports footwear with variable stiffness

Title (de)

Sportschuh mit variabeler Steifigkeit

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport à rigidité variable

Publication

EP 1319346 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02027535 A

Priority

CH 22542001 A

Abstract (en)

The boot consists of a rigid shell (2) that is open along the top of the foot, a supple covering element (6) for the opening, a hinged collar (3), and a liner. The supple element, in the form of two overlapping flaps, is located on the outside of the shell and has semi-rigid elements (7, 8) covering it and joined to the shell by connecting elements (9).

Abstract (fr)

La chaussure pour sport de glisse, en particulier pour le ski, comprend une coque rigide (2) destinée à envelopper partiellement le pied d'un utilisateur, un collier (3) articulé sur la coque (2) et un chausson, ladite coque (2) comportant une partie ouverte facilitant le chaussage et le déchaussage. La chaussure comprend en outre au moins un élément souple (6) couvrant ladite partie ouverte de façon à fermer la chaussure et un élément semi-rigide (7,8) superposé sur ledit élément souple (6) et des moyens de fixation (9) desdits éléments sur la coque rigide (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 7/12; A43C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/12 (2006.01); A43C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 1/00 (2013.01); A43B 5/04 (2013.01); A43B 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319346 A1 20030618; EP 1319346 B1 20040324; CH 695005 A5 20051115; DE 60200290 D1 20040429; DE 60200290 T2 20050310; US 2003126763 A1 20030710; US 6779284 B2 20040824

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200290 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030623

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO