Global Patent Index - EP 1319347 A1

EP 1319347 A1 2003-06-18 - Inner-boot for shoe for gliding sports

Title (en)

Inner-boot for shoe for gliding sports

Title (de)

Innenschuh für Schuh für Gleitsportarten

Title (fr)

Chausson de confort pour chaussure de sport de glisse

Publication

EP 1319347 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02027697 A

Priority

FR 0116279 A

Abstract (en)

The anklet comprises a boot shaped part (1) with a slit (2) in the front of its upper edge to under the instep. The slit has a width such that when closed on the leg the anklet almost completely envelops the leg. The zones abutting the slit have padding (7,8) of different thickness and/or hardness. The thickest padding (7) is supported on the internal side of the leg. The anklet can have a fastening tongue (3).

Abstract (fr)

Le chausson de confort comprend une partie en forme de botte (1) fendue (2) sur le devant de son bord supérieur jusqu'en dessous du cou de pied. La fente (2) est de largeur telle qu'en position fermée sur la jambe, le chausson enveloppe presque complètement la jambe. Les zones jouxtant la fente présentent des rembourrages (7, 8) d'épaisseur et/ou de dureté différentes, le rembourrage le plus épais et/ou le moins dur (7) venant s'appuyer sur le côté interne de la jambe. Le chausson peut être muni d'une languette (3) ou d'un moyen de fermeture. Un tel chausson est particulièrement confortable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 7/20; A43B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/20 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319347 A1 20030618; EP 1319347 B1 20040407; DE 60200348 D1 20040513; DE 60200348 T2 20050512; FR 2833468 A1 20030620; FR 2833468 B1 20040227

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200348 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030623

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO