Global Patent Index - EP 1319351 A2

EP 1319351 A2 2003-06-18 - Applicator assembly for a product, especially cosmetics

Title (en)

Applicator assembly for a product, especially cosmetics

Title (de)

Auftragsvorrichtung für ein vorzugsweise kosmetisches Produkt

Title (fr)

Ensemble applicateur d'un produit, notamment cosmétique

Publication

EP 1319351 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02292892 A

Priority

FR 0115994 A

Abstract (en)

Applicator assembly consists of an applicator of an elastically compressible material surrounding all or part of a cosmetic product in stick form, mounted on a mobile and spring-loaded carrier. In the absence of any pressure on the applicator the cosmetic stick is located beneath its surface, while a pressure applied to the carrier causes the stick to project through the applicator. Applicator assembly (1) consists of an applicator (7) of an elastically compressible material surrounding all or part of a cosmetic product (31) in stick form, mounted on a mobile and spring-loaded carrier (32). In the absence of any pressure on the applicator the cosmetic stick is located beneath its surface (9), while a pressure applied to the underside of the carrier causes the stick to project through the applicator so it can be applied directly to a surface.

Abstract (fr)

La présente demande concerne un ensemble applicateur (1) comportant au moins un applicateur (7) entourant tout ou partie d'un produit, notamment sous forme d'un stick (31), monté sur un élément porte-produit (30) mobile relativement à l'applicateur (7), le produit présentant, à l'opposé de l'élément porte-produit, une surface (33) qui, en l'absence de contrainte sur l'ensemble applicateur, occupe une première position située au niveau ou en dessous d'une face d'application (9) de l'applicateur, ledit élément porte-produit (30) étant monté de sorte que, en réponse à une pression exercée sur l'élément porte-produit, ladite surface (33) se déplace relativement à la face d'application (9), et passe dans une seconde position axiale relativement à cette dernière, ladite surface (33) revenant par rappel élastique dans la première position lorsque cesse la pression.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/02; A45D 40/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/10 (2006.01); A45D 33/00 (2006.01); A45D 33/02 (2006.01); A45D 33/34 (2006.01); A45D 40/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/02 (2006.01); A45D 40/18 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01); B43K 21/00 (2006.01); B43K 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 47/42 (2006.01); B65D 85/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/02 (2013.01); A45D 40/10 (2013.01); A45D 40/262 (2013.01); A45D 2040/105 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319351 A2 20030618; EP 1319351 A3 20070919; CA 2414404 A1 20030611; CA 2414404 C 20070206; CN 1212793 C 20050803; CN 1426713 A 20030702; FR 2833245 A1 20030613; FR 2833245 B1 20040319; JP 2003189933 A 20030708; JP 3862082 B2 20061227; US 2003133737 A1 20030717; US 6890115 B2 20050510

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140117

2013-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130906

2008-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2008-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080319

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI