Global Patent Index - EP 1319355 A2

EP 1319355 A2 2003-06-18 - Chair with lumbar support and conforming back

Title (en)

Chair with lumbar support and conforming back

Title (de)

Stuhl mit Lendenstütze und anpassbare Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Chaise avec support lombaire et dossier adaptable

Publication

EP 1319355 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02027786 A

Priority

US 34067301 P

Abstract (en)

A task chair (20) including seat support structure (26), a backrest frame (68, 112, 122, 150) attached to the seat support structure, and a backrest (72a, 72b, 72c, 72d, 72e) supported by the backrest frame. The backrest includes a back support surface (94a, 94b, 94c, 94d, 94e) which may ergonomically conform to a seated user when the user shifts positions while sitting in the chair. The back support surface includes rigid (80a, 80b, 80c, 80d, 80e) and flexible portions (90a, 90b, 90c, 90d, 90e) connected to one another, the flexible portions allowing resilient flexing of the back support surface to create conformance zones which dynamically support the back of a seated user in an ergonomic manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/44; A47C 7/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/14 (2006.01); A47C 7/44 (2006.01); A47C 7/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/14 (2013.01); A47C 7/448 (2013.01); A47C 7/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319355 A2 20030618; EP 1319355 A3 20040102; US 2003127896 A1 20030710; US 2005052061 A1 20050310

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-09 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060627

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47C 7/44 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47C 7/46 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO