Global Patent Index - EP 1319360 A1

EP 1319360 A1 2003-06-18 - Domestic dishwasher with a front loading door having a recessed panel and a detergent measurer/dispenser supported by the upper rack

Title (en)

Domestic dishwasher with a front loading door having a recessed panel and a detergent measurer/dispenser supported by the upper rack

Title (de)

Haushaltsgeschirrspülmaschine mit einer Tür, die ein einer Vertiefung aufweisenden Paneel aufweist, sowie einen Geschirrspülmitteldosierbehälter, der vom oberen Geschirrkorb gestützt ist

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle avec une porte comportant un panneau avec un évidement, ainsi qu'un doseur/distributeur pour l' agent de lavage supporté par le panier supérieur

Publication

EP 1319360 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830746 A

Priority

EP 01830746 A

Abstract (en)

Domestic dishwasher machine, with a front loading door (3), wherein the detergent measuring/dispensing device (15) is housed in the washing chamber (1) and is supported by the upper rack (16) in a dead zone thereof, wherein the withdrawal of the detergent takes place with the entry of a decalcified water flow into the device (15), at the start of a washing step, and an additive measuring/dispensing device (13), with the relative reservoir (12), is housed in the interspace between a side wall of the washing chamber and a corresponding outer wall, so that the counterdoor (7) for closing the washing chamber, free from the presence of these devices, is drawn into recess for the whole of its height and increases the useful volume of the washing chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4445 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319360 A1 20030618; EP 1319360 B1 20040414; DE 60102828 D1 20040519; DE 60102828 T2 20050428

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131206

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131206

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60102828

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131206

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60102828

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60102828 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020508

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI