Global Patent Index - EP 1319381 A2

EP 1319381 A2 2003-06-18 - Mobile wheeled chair for transporting patients

Title (en)

Mobile wheeled chair for transporting patients

Title (de)

Fahrbarer Stuhl für den Krankentransport

Title (fr)

Chaise mobile à roulettes pour le transport des malades

Publication

EP 1319381 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027075 A

Priority

DE 10161624 A

Abstract (en)

Wheelchair comprises a chassis, seat, back rest (3), arm rests, at least one adjusting device for adjusting at least one seat part which is then fixed in the desired position by a locking device, and a handle (7) fixed to the back rest. The handle has a rotating part (9) rotating about the handle axis whose rotational movement is transferred by a Bowden cable (10) to the adjusting device. <??>Preferred Features: Rotation of the rotating part in one direction releases the locking device and rotation in the opposite direction locks the locking device. The locking device is pre-tensioned in the locked position.

Abstract (de)

Ein fahrbarer Stuhl für den Krankentransport mit einem Fahrgestell 1, an welchem ein Sitz 2, eine Rückenlehne 3 und Armlehnen 4 als Sitzteile relativ zueinander beweglich gelagert sind, wenigstens einer Verstelleinrichtung 5, mit welcher wenigstens eines der Sitzteile verstellbar ist und mittels einer Rasteinrichtung 6 in einer jeweils gewünschten Position fixierbar ist, und einem an der Rückenlehne 3 befestigten Handgriff 7, der ein um die Handgriffachse 8 drehbares Drehteil 9 aufweist, dessen Drehbewegung über einem Bowdenzug 10 auf die Verstelleinrichtung 5 übertragbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/00; A61G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/00 (2006.01); A61G 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/006 (2013.01); A61G 5/121 (2016.11); A61G 5/125 (2016.11)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10161624 C1 20021128; AT 336980 T 20060915; DE 50207921 D1 20061005; EP 1319381 A2 20030618; EP 1319381 A3 20031112; EP 1319381 B1 20060823

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BRUSTMANN, HERBERT

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-03-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207921 P 20061005

2006-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-09-06 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060714

2006-08-30 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-04-07 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20031223

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO