Global Patent Index - EP 1319424 A1

EP 1319424 A1 2003-06-18 - Set of boot and binding device for the boot to a sports article without lifting

Title (en)

Set of boot and binding device for the boot to a sports article without lifting

Title (de)

Aggregat von Schuh und Bindungsanlage ohne Hebung für diesen Schuh an einem Sportgerät

Title (fr)

Ensemble chaussure et dispositif de fixation sans soulèvement de la chaussure à un article de sport

Publication

EP 1319424 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02025848 A

Priority

FR 0116083 A

Abstract (en)

The fixing comprises a movable part and a base (12) fixed to the ski. The movable part comprises a connecting part (14) coupled to the boot which has a curved profile by which it is supported on the base. A small rod (16) connects the connecting part to the base. The connecting part can tip from a bottom position to a top position relative to the base. The movable part comprises a stop surface which in its bottom position engages a stop surface (30) connected to the base in order to prevent the curved profile from separating from the base.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de fixation d'une chaussure à un article de sport, du type comportant une partie mobile (14, 16) et une embase (12) solidaire de l'article de sport, du type dans lequel la partie mobile comporte un organe de liaison (14) à la chaussure qui est destiné à être accroché à la chaussure et qui comporte un profil courbe (20) par lequel il est en appui sur l'embase (12), et une biellette (16) qui relie l'organe de liaison (14) à l'embase (12), du type dans lequel l'organe de liaison (15) est susceptible de basculer d'une position basse à une position haute par rapport à l'embase (12), caractérisé en ce que la partie mobile (14, 16) du dispositif de fixation comporte une surface de butée (28, 17) qui, au moins en position basse de l'organe de liaison (14), coopère avec une surface de butée (26, 30) liée à l'embase (12) pour empêcher le profil courbe (20) de l'organe de liaison (14) de s'écarter de l'embase (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 1/28; A63C 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 1/28 (2006.01); A63C 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 1/28 (2013.01); A63C 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319424 A1 20030618; FR 2833179 A1 20030613; FR 2833179 B1 20040130; NO 20025946 A 20030612; NO 20025946 D0 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060404

2005-11-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SET OF BOOT AND BINDING DEVICE FOR THE BOOT TO A SPORTS ARTICLE WITHOUT LIFTING

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050518

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI