Global Patent Index - EP 1319427 A2

EP 1319427 A2 2003-06-18 - Floor element for sports

Title (en)

Floor element for sports

Title (de)

Sportbodenelement

Title (fr)

Elément de plancher de sports

Publication

EP 1319427 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027618 A

Priority

DE 10161557 A

Abstract (en)

The flooring, for indoor sports, is composed of plastics boards (10) with two parallel surfaces, and at least one locking structure at two end sides (14,18) at right angles to each other, to fit into a complementary locking structure (26,28) at the end sides (12,16) of the neighboring board. At least one surface is coated with a non-stick cladding.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein plattenförmiges Sportbodenelement (10) aus Kunststoff beschrieben. Das Sportbodenelement (10) besitzt zwei zueinander parallele Oberflächen und mindestens eine stirnseitige erste Verbindungsstruktur zur Anbindung an eine komplementäre zweite Verbindungsstruktur (26, 28) eines weiteren Sportbodenelements. Auf mindestens eine der Oberflächen ist eine Beschichtung auf Teflonbasis aufgebracht <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 19/04; E01C 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319427 A2 20030618; EP 1319427 A3 20040102; DE 10161557 A1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUN TRADE GMBH

2005-05-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUN TRADE GMBH

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63C 19/04 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01C 13/04 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO