Global Patent Index - EP 1319435 A2

EP 1319435 A2 2003-06-18 - Method and apparatus for introducing a first medium in a second medium

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for introducing a first medium in a second medium

Title (de)

Method and apparatus for introducing a first medium in a second medium

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour introduire un premier milieu dans un second milieu

Publication

EP 1319435 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02406090 A

Priority

CH 22652001 A

Abstract (en)

Inserting a first medium (M1) into a second medium (M2), in which the first medium is a fluid or powder and the second medium is a fluid or powder, comprises penetrating a flat outer wall (5) of a container (3) arranged in a flow channel (1) and through which the second medium flows. The first medium in the outer wall, on the surface of the outer wall or outside of the outer wall is contacted with the second medium and inserted into it. <??>An Independent claim is also included for a device for carrying out the above process. <??>Preferred Features: The first medium is impinged with a pressure within the container. The container is driven using a drive and a rotating movement is produced. The penetration rate of the first medium through the outer wall of the container can be periodically changed using a moderator.

Abstract (de)

Beim Verfahren und der Vorrichtung zum Eintragen eines ersten, fluiden oder pulverförmigen Mediums (M1) in ein zweites, fluides Medium (M2) wird das erste Medium (M1) innerhalb eines Strömungskanals (1), in dem das zweite Medium (M2) einen Behälter (3) an-, um-, oder überströmt, vom Inneren des Behälters (3) durch dessen flächenartig ausgebildete, für das erste Medium (M1) mindestens teilweise durchlässige Aussenwand (5) in das zweite Medium (M2) eingetragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/06 (2006.01); B01F 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04028 (2013.01); B01F 5/0451 (2013.01); B01F 5/0453 (2013.01); B01F 5/0465 (2013.01); B01F 5/0618 (2013.01); B01F 7/12 (2013.01); F24F 2006/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319435 A2 20030618; EP 1319435 A3 20041006

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-08-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-06-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO