Global Patent Index - EP 1319443 A1

EP 1319443 A1 2003-06-18 - PORTABLE PAINT BOOTH USED FOR THE REPAIR OF AUTOMOBILE BODIES

Title (en)

PORTABLE PAINT BOOTH USED FOR THE REPAIR OF AUTOMOBILE BODIES

Title (de)

TRAGBARE LACKIERKABINE ZUR REPARATUR VON FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIEN

Title (fr)

CABINE DE PEINTURE PORTABLE POUVANT ETRE UTILISEE DANS LA REPARATION DES CARROSSERIES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1319443 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01938272 A

Priority

  • ES 0100232 W
  • ES 200001472 A

Abstract (en)

A portable paint carbin applicable to the repair of motor vehicle bodies, consisting of a body (1) formed by inflatable components (2), situated vertically, joined by means of horizontal cross beams (2'), having side closing areas (3) shaped as flexible laminas (3), provided with a conduit (15) for the entry of air and a second conduit or connection (13) for the evacuation of air from the inside to the outside, having a pre-filter (16) in the upper part and lighting tubes (17), as well as filters (11) and (12), fresh air intake (10), trap (9), heating element (8), motor (6) provided with a sucking propeller (7) and a driving propeller (7') respectively, as well as a grille (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 16/80 (2018.02); B05B 16/40 (2018.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0196033A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319443 A1 20030618; EP 1319443 B1 20040915; AT 276048 T 20041015; AU 6397001 A 20011224; DE 60105624 D1 20041021; DE 60105624 T2 20050811; ES 2167242 A1 20020501; ES 2167242 B1 20031101; PT 1319443 E 20050131; WO 0196033 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180605

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180605

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60105624

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B05B0015120000

- IPC: B05B0016000000

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170607

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050605

2005-06-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050605

2005-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GONZALEZ URDIALES, LUIS MIGUEL

2005-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040915

2005-02-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20041213

2005-01-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040404290

2005-01-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GONZALEZ URDIALES, LUIS MIGUEL

2005-01-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: GONZALEZ URDIALES, LUIS MIGUEL

2005-01-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: DIAZ MARTIN, JULIAN

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041226

2004-12-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60105624 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021212

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI